Gospel Assembly Church of Houma, Inc. v. Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Gospel Assembly Church of Houma, Inc.
Defendant: Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company
Interested Party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Case Number: 2:2024cv01468
Filed: June 7, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Shiena Marie N. Burke, Ryan Dahlquist, Miranda Morgan, and Antonio J. Torres, be WITHDRAWN as counsel of record for Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company in this matter. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/24/2024. (pp)
July 23, 2024 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Shiena Marie N. Burke, Ryan Dahlquist, Miranda Morgan and Antonio J. Torres as Attorney by Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hailey, James)
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - ORDER re Motions to Compel and Payment of Mediation Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 06/17/2024.(lag)
June 17, 2024 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Gospel Assembly Church of Houma, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Frontline Public Adjusting for Gospel Assembly Church of Houma, Inc. (Dugas, Preston)
June 10, 2024 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent GNW Holding, Inc. for Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company (Hailey, James)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 7.1, nongovernmental corporate parties must file a disclosure statement with their first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. IT IS ORDERED that any nongovernmental corporate parties in this matter file the required disclosure statement within seven (7) days of this order. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn)
June 10, 2024 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Notice of Compliance. Document was incorrectly filed as a attachment. Notice of Compliance should be filed as a separate document instead of an attachment to the Notice of Removal. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is needed. (go)
June 10, 2024 Filing 3 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(go)
June 7, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Compliance by Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (go)
June 7, 2024 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (meb)
June 7, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 32nd Judicial District Court - Terrebonne Parish, case number 197554 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10559359) filed by Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Service Copies, #2 Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures, #3 Certified Mail Receipt, #4 Certificate of Filing State Court Record, #5 Certified copy of State Court Pleadings, #6 List of Attorneys and Parties in State Court Action, #7 Certificate of Compliance, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney James W. Hailey, III added to party Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Hailey, James) Modified text on 6/10/2024 (go).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gospel Assembly Church of Houma, Inc. v. Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Lena Dawn Giangrosso
Represented By: Erica L Laroux
Represented By: Carley Ann Faucheux
Represented By: James W. Hailey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gospel Assembly Church of Houma, Inc.
Represented By: Preston James Dugas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By: Francis Joseph Lobrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?