Santalla v. QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Serina Santalla
Defendant: QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Interested Party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Case Number: 2:2024cv01531
Filed: June 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - ORDER re Motions to Compel and Payment of Mediation Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 06/17/2024.(lag)
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS FOURTH AMENDMENT TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(pp)
June 13, 2024 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (meb)
June 13, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Compliance by QBE Specialty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Siegel, Robert)
June 13, 2024 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by QBE Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent QBE Investments (North America), Inc., Corporate Parent QBE Insurance Holdings Pty. Ltd., Corporate Parent QBE Insurance Group, Ltd., Corporate Parent QBE Holdings, Inc. for QBE Specialty Insurance Company (Siegel, Robert)
June 13, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2023-9057 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10566740) filed by QBE Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email and Estimate, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Robert I. Siegel added to party QBE Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Siegel, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santalla v. QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serina Santalla
Represented By: Charles L Gowland, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: William Prescott Worsley
Represented By: Jake Sebastian Clements
Represented By: Robert I. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By: Francis Joseph Lobrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?