Diaz Rubio et al v. GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Morris Bart LLC and Jorge Diaz Rubio
Defendant: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Interested Party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Case Number: 2:2024cv01535
Filed: June 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2024 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Notice of Compliance. Filing attorney incorrectly linked document to document 4. Clerk properly linked document to document 1. (cs)
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - ORDER re Motions to Compel and Payment of Mediation Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 06/17/2024.(lag)
June 21, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Compliance by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Lyonnais, Hailey) Modified link/text on 6/24/2024 (cs).
June 14, 2024 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not still be fillable. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button and print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (cs)
June 14, 2024 Filing 4 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. (cs)
June 14, 2024 Filing 3 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to Ida CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(cs)
June 13, 2024 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S Vance and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (meb)
June 13, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th JDC, case number 842-534 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BLAEDC-10567234) filed by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Hailey Elise Lyonnais added to party GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Lyonnais, Hailey) (Attachment 5 replaced on 6/14/2024) (cs). Modified image/text on 6/14/2024 (cs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz Rubio et al v. GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Bart LLC
Represented By: William F. Longwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Diaz Rubio
Represented By: Dominick F. Impastato, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Arnold
Represented By: Hailey Elise Lyonnais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By: Francis Joseph Lobrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?