Lagniappe Properties, LLC v. Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Lagniappe Properties, LLC
Defendant: Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company
Interested Party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Case Number: 2:2024cv01541
Filed: June 14, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2024 Filing 13 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Ocean Harbor Casualty Company, Corporate Parent GNW Holding, Inc. for Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company (Giangrosso, Lena) Modified on 8/1/2024 (sa).
July 31, 2024 Filing 12 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand, filed by Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Giangrosso, Lena) Modified on 8/1/2024 (sa).
June 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Withdraw as Attorneys. Attorneys Miranda Tucker Morgan; Antonio Jose Torres; Shiena Marie Burke and Ryan T Dahlquist WITHDRAWN as counsel for Defendant. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 6/24/2024. (sa)
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - ORDER re Motions to Compel and Payment of Mediation Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 06/17/2024.(lag)
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time. IT IS ORDERED that Ocean Harbor's Motion for Leave to Serve Jurisdictional Discovery be and is hereby GRANTED and Ocean Harbor is permitted to serve limited jurisdictional discovery upon Plaintiff sufficient to permit Ocean Harbor to file the required Amended Notice of Removal. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that Ocean Harbor's Motion for an Extension of Time to file the required Amended Notice of Removal be and is hereby GRANTED and Ocean Harbor shall have 45 days from this Order to file its Amended Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 6/20/2024. (sa)
June 18, 2024 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Removal Notice and for Jurisdictional Discovery by Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Giangrosso, Lena) Modified on 6/20/2024 (sa).
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND REASONS - The Court finds that Defendant has failed to adequately allege diversity of citizenship. Defendant is GRANTED LEAVE TO AMEND the Notice of Removal within 20 days from the entry of this Order. Failure to file timely an amended notice will result in dismissal for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 6/17/2024.(sa)
June 17, 2024 Filing 6 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to Ida CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(amj)
June 14, 2024 Filing 5 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
June 14, 2024 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Antonio J. Torres, Shiena Marie N. Burke, Miranda T. Morgan and Ryan T. Dahlquist as Attorney by Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hailey, James)
June 14, 2024 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent GNW Holding, Inc. for Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company (Hailey, James)
June 14, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Compliance ~ List of Attorneys and Parties in State Court Action ~ by Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Hailey, James)
June 14, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Orleans Parish Civil District Court, case number 2023-08844-G-11 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10568467) filed by Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 State Court Pleadings, #5 28 usc 1446(D) Compliance Cert, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney James W. Hailey, III added to party Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Hailey, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lagniappe Properties, LLC v. Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Lena Dawn Giangrosso
Represented By: Erica L Laroux
Represented By: Carley Ann Faucheux
Represented By: James W. Hailey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lagniappe Properties, LLC
Represented By: Ramsey T Marcello
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Siemssen
Represented By: Bret D. Guepet, Jr
Represented By: Albert J. Nicaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By: Francis Joseph Lobrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?