Bourg v. GeoVera Advantage Insurance Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kent Bourg
Defendant: GeoVera Advantage Insurance Services, Inc. and GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Interested Party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Case Number: 2:2024cv01550
Filed: June 14, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - ORDER re Motions to Compel and Payment of Mediation Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 06/17/2024.(lag)
June 19, 2024 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent GeoVera Holdings, Inc. (Delaware) for GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company (Kaul, Christopher)
June 19, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company.(Kaul, Christopher) Modified on 6/20/2024 (gla).
June 17, 2024 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Notice of Removal. Document contains incorrect case number. All future pleadings must reflect 24-1550 H(4). (go)
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - FOURTH AMENDMENT TO IDA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(go)
June 14, 2024 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (meb)
June 14, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Terrebonne Parish Court, case number 198119 (Fee previously paid) filed by GeoVera Advantage Insurance Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings)(Kaul, Christopher)
June 14, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Compliance by GeoVera Advantage Insurance Services, Inc. Notice Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) re #3 Notice of Removal. (Kaul, Christopher) Modified text/link on 6/17/2024 (go). Modified on 6/17/2024 (go).
June 14, 2024 Filing 1 **FILED IN ERROR-SEE DOC. 3** NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Terrebonne Parish Court, case number 198119 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10568992) filed by GeoVera Advantage Insurance Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings)Attorney Christopher W. Kaul added to party GeoVera Advantage Insurance Services, Inc.(pty:dft).(Kaul, Christopher) Modified on 6/17/2024 (go).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bourg v. GeoVera Advantage Insurance Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GeoVera Advantage Insurance Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jared Landon Shurman
Represented By: Jacob Lasley
Represented By: Christopher W. Kaul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Bourg
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By: Francis Joseph Lobrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?