Fox Acoustice, LLC et al v. Evanston Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Fox Acoustics, LLC, Fox Acoustice, LLC, Katie D. Fox and Joseph C. Fox
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company
Interested Party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Case Number: 2:2024cv01560
Filed: June 17, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - ORDER re Motions to Compel and Payment of Mediation Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 06/17/2024.(lag)
June 20, 2024 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Notice of Compliance. Filing attorney incorrectly linked document to document 4. Clerk properly linked document to document 1. (cs)
June 18, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) by Evanston Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B)(Kleeman, Douglas) Modified link/text on 6/20/2024 (cs).
June 18, 2024 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Evanston Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for Evanston Insurance Company (Kleeman, Douglas)
June 18, 2024 Filing 4 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (cs)
June 18, 2024 Filing 3 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to Ida CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(cs)
June 17, 2024 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S Vance and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
June 17, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 32nd Judicial District Court, case number 197866 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10570206) filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Douglas M. Kleeman added to party Evanston Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Kleeman, Douglas) Modified text on 6/18/2024 (cs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox Acoustice, LLC et al v. Evanston Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fox Acoustics, LLC
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Represented By: Evan Michael Stark
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fox Acoustice, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie D. Fox
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Represented By: Evan Michael Stark
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph C. Fox
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Represented By: Evan Michael Stark
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: Alexander Arthur Lauricella
Represented By: Douglas M. Kleeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By: Francis Joseph Lobrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?