Mathis et al v. QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Lynn Mathis and Michelle Matis
Defendant: QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Interested Party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Case Number: 2:2024cv01569
Filed: June 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by QBE Specialty Insurance Company.(Stephens, Stefanie)
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - ORDER re Motions to Compel and Payment of Mediation Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 06/17/2024.(lag)
June 18, 2024 Filing 5 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to Ida CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(meb)
June 18, 2024 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (car)
June 18, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Compliance by QBE Specialty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Siegel, Robert) Modified text on 6/18/2024 (meb).
June 18, 2024 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by QBE Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent QBE Investments (North America), Inc., Corporate Parent QBE Insurance Holdings Pty. Ltd., Corporate Parent QBE Insurance Group, Ltd., Corporate Parent QBE Holdings, Inc. for QBE Specialty Insurance Company (Siegel, Robert)
June 18, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2023-9009 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10572005) filed by QBE Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email, SPOL and Noble Estimate, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Robert I. Siegel added to party QBE Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Siegel, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathis et al v. QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Mathis
Represented By: Charles L Gowland, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Matis
Represented By: Charles L Gowland, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By: Francis Joseph Lobrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: William Prescott Worsley
Represented By: Stefanie N. Stephens
Represented By: Robert I. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?