Petite v. Hinds
Plaintiff: Sydney Petite
Defendant: Colin Jacob hinds
Case Number: 2:2024cv02033
Filed: August 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Colin Jacob Hinds. Answer due date EXTENDED through November 4, 2024. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/15/2024. (sa)
October 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or responsive pleadings to Complaint - Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1. (gla)
October 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 COMPLAINT by Colin Jacob Hinds. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Attorney David Matthew Fink added to party Colin Jacob Hinds(pty:dft).(Fink, David) Modified on 10/15/2024 (gla).
August 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Colin Jacob Hinds. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(gla)
August 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint, Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (gla)
August 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Ducote, Richard)
August 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
August 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10659609) filed by Sydney Petite. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)Attorney Richard Lynn Ducote added to party Sydney Petite(pty:pla).(Ducote, Richard) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/21/2024) (gla). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/21/2024) (gla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petite v. Hinds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sydney Petite
Represented By: Richard Lynn Ducote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin Jacob hinds
Represented By: David Matthew Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?