Byrd v. BP Exploration and Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Byrd
Defendant: Transocean Deepwater, Inc., BP Exploration and Production, Inc., BP America Production Company, Transocean Holdings, LLC, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc. and Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2024cv02205
Filed: September 6, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl J Barbier
Referring Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR THE B3 BUNDLE. Signed by Judge Carl J Barbier.(cg)
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Regarding Filing Requests for Summons and Summons Returns; ORDERED that requests for summons shall be filed in the docket for the member case, as opposed to the master docket. FURTHER ORDERED that summons returns shall not be filed into any docket, master or member, unless filing the summons return becomes necessary (for example, in connection with a motion for default judgment). When it is necessary to file a summons return, the attorney shall avoid filing the summons return as a separate, stand-alone document in the master docket. Instead, the summons return shall be filed as an exhibit to the motion, etc., to which it relates.(Doc #10204 in 10-md-2179). Signed by Judge Carl J Barbier.(cg)
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL ORDERS #1, #11, #12 1st Amended, #25, #31, #41 2nd Amended, #68,#68 1st Amended. Signed by Judge Carl J Barbier. (Attachments: #1 PTO 11, #2 PTO 12 1st Amended, #3 PTO 25, #4 PTO 31, #5 PTO 41 2nd Amended, #6 PTO 68, #7 PTO 68 1st Amended)(cg)
September 13, 2024 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Southern; Case Number 1:24-cv-00300. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (my)
September 10, 2024 Filing 8 Conditional Transfer Order (MDL) from Eastern District of Louisiana requesting transfer of action. Entire case file sent to requesting District. (cjr) [Transferred from alsd on 9/13/2024.]
September 5, 2024 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Byrd. Halliburton Energy Services, Inc waiver sent on 8/27/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (Ajwani, Sheeba) [Transferred from alsd on 9/13/2024.]
August 28, 2024 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Byrd. Transocean Deepwater Inc waiver sent on 8/27/2024, answer due 10/28/2024; Transocean Holdings LLC waiver sent on 8/27/2024, answer due 10/28/2024; Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc waiver sent on 8/27/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (Ajwani, Sheeba) [Transferred from alsd on 9/13/2024.]
August 28, 2024 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Byrd. BP America Production Company waiver sent on 8/27/2024, answer due 10/28/2024; BP Exploration and Production, Inc. waiver sent on 8/27/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (Ajwani, Sheeba) [Transferred from alsd on 9/13/2024.]
August 27, 2024 Notice of Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Sheeba Ajwani, Esq.. Pursuant to the Case Management Order entered in 21-cv-5000-KD-MU-C only the pro hac vice fee is being paid. I certify that documentation has been previously filed in 21-cv-00171. ( Filing fee $ 100, Receipt number AALSDC-3449483, Online Credit Card Payment.) (Ajwani, Sheeba) [Transferred from alsd on 9/13/2024.]
August 26, 2024 Filing 4 SECOND OMNIBUS ORDER MODIFYING B3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 11/13/2023. (cjr) [Transferred from alsd on 9/13/2024.]
August 26, 2024 Filing 3 OMNIBUS ORDER MODIFYING B3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 12/17/2021. (cjr) [Transferred from alsd on 9/13/2024.]
August 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 B3 Case Management Order. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 08/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Protective Order, #2 HIPAA Protective Order, #3 Attachment C) (cjr) [Transferred from alsd on 9/13/2024.]
August 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405 receipt number AALSDC-3448162, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Andrew Byrd. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 11/21/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Durkee, Charles)[Transferred from alsd on 9/13/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrd v. BP Exploration and Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Byrd
Represented By: Charles David Durkee
Represented By: Sheeba Shyam Ajwani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transocean Deepwater, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration and Production, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transocean Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?