De La Rose v. Dearborn Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Shayla De La Rose
Defendant: Dearborn Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2025cv00223
Filed: January 31, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2025 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Dearborn Life Insurance Company on 2/5/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. (Pellegrin, David)
February 3, 2025 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dearborn Life Insurance Company. (gla)
January 31, 2025 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (sek)
January 31, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dearborn Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10866764) filed by Shayla De La Rose. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney David C. Pellegrin added to party Shayla De La Rose(pty:pla).(Pellegrin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De La Rose v. Dearborn Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shayla De La Rose
Represented By: David C. Pellegrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dearborn Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?