DeRocha v. Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Kevin DeRocha
Defendant: Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2025cv00227
Filed: January 31, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brandon S Long
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2025 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company of America on 2/5/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. (Pellegrin, David)
February 3, 2025 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company of America. (car)
January 31, 2025 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Brandon S. Long and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
January 31, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10867430) filed by Kevin DeRocha. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney David C. Pellegrin added to party Kevin DeRocha(pty:pla).(Pellegrin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeRocha v. Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin DeRocha
Represented By: David C. Pellegrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?