Guidry v. Hooper et al
Plaintiff: Eugene Lamond Guidry
Defendant: Tim Hooper, D Brown, Tyrenni T Berry and William Russo
Case Number: 2:2025cv00230
Filed: January 29, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2025 Filing 4 OBJECTION to #3 Report and Recommendations by Eugene Lamond Guidry (cf) Image QC'd on 3/21/2025 (amj).
February 11, 2025 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Eugene Lamond Guidry. It is RECOMMENDED that Eugene Lamond Guidry's civil action under 42 U.S.C. 1983 be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana for further proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 2/25/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 2/11/2025.(lb)(NEF Sec H)
January 29, 2025 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eugene Lamond Guidry. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (cf)
January 29, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tyrenni T Berry, D Brown, Tim Hooper, William Russo filed by Eugene Lamond Guidry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guidry v. Hooper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Lamond Guidry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyrenni T Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?