Garlington v. Dear et al
Plaintiff: Allan Clay Garlington, Jr.
Defendant: Frank Dear and Todd Cupp
Case Number: 2:2025cv00284
Filed: February 7, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2025 Filing 9 Letter to the Court from Allan Clay Garlington, Jr., dated 3/21/25. (bwn)
March 21, 2025 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: IT IS RECOMMENDED that Allan Clay Garlington Jr.'s civil action under 42 U.S.C. 1983 be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana for further proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 4/4/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 3/21/2025.(pp)
March 20, 2025 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Allan Clay Garlington, Jr. (cf)
March 17, 2025 Filing 6 Letter to the Court from Allan Clay Garlington, Jr., dated March 11, 2025. (bwn)
March 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SHOW CAUSE ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff Allan Clay Garlington Jr. SHOW CAUSE in writing on or before April 4, 2025, why this case should not be dismissed for his failure to prosecute by his failure to pay the filing fee or submit a certified pauper application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 3/14/2025.(pp)
March 10, 2025 Filing 5 Letter to the Court from Allan Clay Garlington, Jr., dated February 26, 2025. (bwn)
March 10, 2025 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Allan Clay Garlington, Jr. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(bwn)
February 12, 2025 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 3/5/2025. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application Form) (cf)
February 7, 2025 Filing 1 ***DEFICIENT*** COMPLAINT against Todd Cupp, Frank Dear filed by Allan Clay Garlington Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garlington v. Dear et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Dear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Cupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan Clay Garlington, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?