Bell v. Driskill et al
Defendant: J.D. Driskill, Traci McNeil, Pam Tarbor and Jennifer Plunkett
Petitioner: Christopher Charles Bell
Case Number: 2:2025cv00286
Filed: February 7, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl J Barbier
Referring Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2025 Filing 6 Receipt of Case Transfer to Western District of Louisiana (gla)
March 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND REASONS: Case transferred to Western District of Louisiana. FURTHER ORDERED that determination of pauper status is DEFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 3/6/2025.(lb)
March 3, 2025 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Charles Bell. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (cf) Image QC'd on 3/21/2025 (amj).
March 3, 2025 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against J.D. Driskill, Traci McNeil, Jennifer Plunkett, Pam Tarbor filed by Christopher Charles Bell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cf)
February 12, 2025 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 3/5/2025. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application Form) (cf)
February 7, 2025 Filing 1 ***DEFICIENT*** COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Christopher Charles Bell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Driskill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Charles Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.D. Driskill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traci McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Tarbor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Plunkett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?