Sullivan v. Dougar et al
Plaintiff: Laval Nolan Sullivan
Defendant: Deputy Dougar, Deputy McDaniel and Deputy Harris
Case Number: 2:2025cv00287
Filed: February 6, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Laval Nolan Sullivan: IT IS ORDERED that on or before April 18, 2025, plaintiff must either submit a completed pauper application or pay the required filing fee. Failure to comply with this Order will result in a recommendation for dismissal of the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 3/20/2025. (rkr)
February 12, 2025 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 3/5/2025. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit) (sdp)
February 6, 2025 Filing 1 ***DEFICIENT***COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Laval Nolan Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Dougar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laval Nolan Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Dougar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?