Roberts v. Day et al
Plaintiff: Bryan Clayton Roberts
Defendant: Travis Day, Floyd Brooks, Gary Westcott and Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2025cv00360
Filed: February 20, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2025 Filing 9 Response by Bryan Clayton Roberts to #7 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(sdp) Image QC'd on 4/11/2025 (cf).
March 20, 2025 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby: Spears Hearing held on 3/20/2025. (pp)
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is hereby scheduled without oral argument for March 26, 2025. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff must certify in writing the steps he has taken to secure counsel within ten (10) days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 3/11/2025.(pp)
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SCHEDULING SPEARS HEARING: A SPEARS HEARING BY PHONE is hereby scheduled with the undersigned Magistrate Judge on MARCH 20, 2025, at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 3/11/2025.(pp)(cc:Warden,Rayburn Correctional Center)
March 7, 2025 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Hearing by Bryan Clayton Roberts. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(bwn)
March 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAUPER ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $.20 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to Bryan Clayton Roberts in monthly payments as set out in document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to WITHHOLD issuance of summons until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 3/5/2025.(pp)(NEF:Financial; cc:Warden)
February 20, 2025 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Bryan Clayton Roberts. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (sdp)
February 20, 2025 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bryan Clayton Roberts. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (sdp) Image QC'd on 3/10/2025 (cf).
February 20, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Bryan Clayton Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Notice to the Court, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(sdp) Image QC'd on 3/10/2025 (cf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Day et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Clayton Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floyd Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Westcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?