Adams, et al v. United Assoc of Jour, et al
Case Number: 3:1998cv00400
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 726 RULING granting in part and denying in part 702 Motion to Amend Judgment. Defendant's motion to amend Ruling is granted in part, and the Plaintiffs' Title VII claims are dismissed with prejudice based on untimeliness as set forth herein. Defendant's motion to amend ruling is denied in part, and John Green's Title VII claims remain pending. Granting 720 Motion to Strike its motion to amend ruling, and denying 717 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/3/2019. (EDC)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 700 RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, AFL-CIO, Local 198's 639 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/18/2019. (SWE)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 698 NOTICE REGARDING REASONS FOR JUDGMENT: The Court issues this notice to provide information to the parties concerning the Court's ruling on Defendant's 639 Motion for Summary Judgment regarding timeliness of Plaintiffs' claims. The Co urt will issue oral reasons for judgment on Defendant's motion regarding thePlaintiffs who do not oppose the motion on July 16, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 1. Counsel shall participate by telephone. Counsel for Defendant is responsible for c oordinating the call to the Court (225-389-3568). All parties must participate from a landline. The Court will then issue written reasons for judgment on Defendant's motion regarding the Plaintiffs who oppose themotion. Once the Court has ruled on the pending motion in its entirety, the Court will notice a status conference with all counsel to discuss the remaining claims. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 07/03/2019. (NLT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams, et al v. United Assoc of Jour, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?