Clark v. State of Louisiana, et al

Plaintiff: Jeffery C Clark
Defendant: All Defendants, Angola State Penitentiary, Billy Bagget, David Bonnett, Darren Bordelon, Burl Cain, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Douglas Durrett, Michael Garner, Jimmy Johnson, LSP Swat Team, Joseph Lamartinire, Paul Perkins, David Ross, State of Louisiana, Unknown Defendants and Ronald Welch
Defendant- Consolidated: Billy Bagget, David Bonnett, Darren Bordelon, John Doe, Douglas Durrett, Michael Garner, Jimmy Johnson, Joseph Lamartinire, Paul Perkins, John Roe, David Ross, Richard L. Stalder and Ronald Welch
Case Number: 3:2000cv00956
Filed: December 28, 2000
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2015 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 173 Motion to Quash with leave to refile in the Court where compliance is required. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/21/2015. (LLH)
August 3, 2015 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 133 MOTION to Compel Entry Upon Land and 146 MOTION to Stay Motion to Compel Entry Upon Land filed by Jeffery C Clark.A Telephone Status Conference set for 8/7/2015 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 8/3/2015. (LLH)
November 3, 2014 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiffs 100 Motion to Compel Discovery be and it is hereby DENIED IN PART, such that the defendants shall not be compelled to produce the documentation requested in the plaintiffs Requests for Production Nos. 3(a) and (b) and 4(a) and (b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 11/3/2014. (LLH)
August 8, 2014 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 100 Motion to Compel Discovery such that within 30 days of the date of this Order, the defendants shall more fully respond to the plaintiffs Requests for Production Nos. 2(a), 8, 12 and 19 as outlined above. Within 30 days o f the date of this Order, the defendants shall file a supplemental memorandum addressing the alleged potential threat to security presented by the production of documentation requested in the plaintiffs Requests for Production Nos. 3(a) and (b) and 4(a) and (b). The plaintiffs request for costs and attorneys fees associated with the instant Motion be and it is hereby DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 8/8/2014. (SMG)
September 27, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING on REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The court approves and adopts the report and recommendation of the magistrate judge. The motion 38 to consolidate is hereby DENIED.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 09/27/2012. (CGP)
September 10, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 30 Motion to Unseal Discovery Documents, such that five (5) days after the entry of this Order, the Clerk of Court shall make the pleadings and attachments filed under seal in Civil Action No. 00-0957-RET-DLD, at rec.doc.no. 25, available to plaintiff Jeffery C. Clark, through his attorney, and shall otherwise retain these pleadings and attachments under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 9/10/2012. (JDL)
December 6, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Lift Stay and to sever his individual claims from this consolidated litigation, be and it is hereby granted, and that Civil Action No. 00-0956-JJB-DLD be reinstated on the Docket of the Court.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/5/2011. (CMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. State of Louisiana, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Defendants
Represented By: L. J. Hymel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angola State Penitentiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Bagget
Represented By: Michael Reese Davis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bonnett
Represented By: Michael Reese Davis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Bordelon
Represented By: Michael Reese Davis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Represented By: Michael Reese Davis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Public Safety and Corrections
Represented By: Michael Reese Davis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Durrett
Represented By: Michael Reese Davis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Johnson
Represented By: Michael Reese Davis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSP Swat Team
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lamartinire
Represented By: Michael Reese Davis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Michael Reese Davis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant- consolidated: Billy Bagget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant- consolidated: David Bonnett
Represented By: Douglas Gist Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant- consolidated: Darren Bordelon
Represented By: Douglas Gist Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant- consolidated: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant- consolidated: Douglas Durrett
Represented By: Douglas Gist Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant- consolidated: Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant- consolidated: Jimmy Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant- consolidated: Joseph Lamartinire
Represented By: Douglas Gist Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant- consolidated: Paul Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant- consolidated: John Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant- consolidated: David Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant- consolidated: Richard L. Stalder
Represented By: Michael Reese Davis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant- consolidated: Ronald Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery C Clark
Represented By: Burton P. Guidry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?