Conner v. LA Dept of Health

Case Number: 3:2002cv00284
Filed: March 19, 2002
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2012 98 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting 96 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court hereby GRANTS Defendant's motion for reconsideration, and Defendant's original motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/16/2012. (CGP)
October 12, 2012 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 10/11/2012. (LLH)
January 7, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING affirming 62 the ruling of the magistrate judge. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 1/7/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conner v. LA Dept of Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?