Price, et al v. PCS Nitrogen Fert, et al

Plaintiff: Dennis Price and Robert Sholar
Defendant: PCS Nitrogen Fertilizer Operations, Inc. and PCS Nitrogen Fertilizer, L.P. ,
Case Number: 3:2003cv00153
Filed: March 15, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2012 201 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 189 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 189 Motion for Extension of Time; denying 189 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/2/2012. (LSM)
February 13, 2012 187 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 160 Motion for Ruling that "Triple Damages" are not Available, or Alternatively, are Limited. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/10/2012. (LSM)
February 1, 2012 186 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 166 Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/1/12. (DCB)
March 15, 2010 143 Opinion or Order of the Court Ruling on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law requesting dismissal of plaintiffs' claims involving conduct prior to 1/27/2002, is granted. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 3/15/2010. (CMM,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price, et al v. PCS Nitrogen Fert, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCS Nitrogen Fertilizer Operations, Inc.
Represented By: Melanie Moreland Hartmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCS Nitrogen Fertilizer, L.P. ,
Represented By: A. Edward Hardin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Price
Represented By: Joseph John LaPlace, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sholar
Represented By: Joseph John LaPlace, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?