Federal Insurance v. New Hampshire Insura, et al

Case Number: 3:2003cv00385
Filed: May 21, 2003
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2010 70 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 63 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 50 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by New Hampshire Insurance Company is granted and judgment shall be entered in favor of dft, dismissing this action. 60 Motion for Oral Argument filed by Federal Insurance Company is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/31/10. (BP, )
April 30, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING & ORDER: 49 Motion to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of New Hampshire Insurance Company, Deposition of James Maddiona and Other Discovery is denied without prejudice to Federal refiling such motion after the Court has issued a ruling concer ning the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by defendant, New Hampshire Insurance Company. 51 Cross Motion for Protective Order is granted in part in that discovery in this matter shall be temporarily stayed until after the Court has issued a ruling concerning New Hampshire's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 4/30/10. (BP, )
January 4, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 44 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge 32 Motion to Dismiss filed by AIG Technical Services, New Hampshire Insurance Company. The Motion to Dismiss is granted in part, in that plaintiff's claims against Chartis Claims, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice and denied in part with respect to plaintiff's claims against New Hampshire Insurance Company. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 01/04/2010. (NLT, )
November 2, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by New Hampshire Insurance Company and AIG Technical Services, now known as Chartis Claims, Inc....It is recommended that the Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED IN PART, in that pltfs claims against Chartis Claims, Inc., should be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and DENIED IN PART, with respect to pltfs claims against New Hampshire Insurance Company... Objections to R&R due by 11/17/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 11/2/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Insurance v. New Hampshire Insura, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?