Kohler v. Englade, et al

Case Number: 3:2003cv00857
Filed: November 14, 2003
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 76 MOTION for New Trial filed by Shannon Kohler. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/17/09. (BP, )
June 17, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Shannon Kohler against Christopher Johnson in the sum of $20,000.00 for Compensatory Damages, together with interest and costs according to law. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/17/09. (BP, )
June 8, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 63 MOTION to Quash TRIAL SUBPOENA filed by City of Baton Rouge. Additionally, it is ORDERED that a protective order be issued preventing any further discovery and/or production of documents from the City of Baton Rouge. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/8/09. (BP, )
June 3, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING DENYING 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Parish of East Baton Rouge, Pat Englade, Christopher Johnson, City of Baton Rouge and GRANTING 58 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Shannon Kohler,. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/3/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kohler v. Englade, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?