Turner, et al v. Talbert, et al

Case Number: 3:2004cv00450
Filed: July 1, 2004
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2011 98 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION: Accordingly, the claims of all plaintiffs are DISMISSED with prejudice at their cost. The Court exercises its discretion in declining to award attorneys fees to either party since neither plaintiffs nor Pan American acted in bad faith.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/26/2011. (CMM)
January 4, 2011 90 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 87 Second Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 01/04/2011. (NLT) Modified on 1/7/2011 to mark the document as a written opinion (NLT).
September 25, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 54 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Pan American Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/25/09. (BP, )
July 30, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 51 MOTION for Reconsideration of 50 Order on Motion to Certify Class filed by Vena Cormier, John Shipman, Angie Malone, Julie Constance, Wesley J Nixon, Sonya Turner, Charlotte Jourdan. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/30/09. (BP, )
June 15, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: This Court DENIES 37 Pltfs Motion for Certification. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/15/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner, et al v. Talbert, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?