Smith et al v. New Leaf Associates, L.L.C. et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv00919
Filed: June 29, 2005
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2013 159 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING denying 120 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 131 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 146 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E. Foote on 03/19/2013. (Williams, Lysandra)
August 24, 2010 130 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 115 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge....The pltfs 98 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 8/23/2010. (JDL, )
August 12, 2009 102 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 94 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 81 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Quantum Business Consultants, LLC, is GRANTED, and plaintiffs' claims against Quantum Business Consultants, L.L.C. are dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 8/11/09. (BP, )
July 1, 2009 94 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Quantum Business Consultants, LLC. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Quantum Business Consultants, L.L.C.'s motion for summary judgment (rec. doc. 81) should be GRANTED, and plaintiffs' claims against Quantum Business Consultants, L.L.C. should be dismissed, with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 7/16/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 7/1/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. New Leaf Associates, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?