Robinson v. State of LA et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv01016
Filed: August 10, 2005
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2014 280 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 278 Motion for Appointment of Independent Counsel and 275 Motion for Court-Appointed Expert Witnesses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 3/13/2014. (SMG)
May 11, 2011 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 147 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 5/10/2011. (PJH)
April 15, 2011 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 142 plaintiff's Motion for Recusal of Judge Ralph E. Tyson and Magistrate Judge Docia L. Dalby.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 4/15/2011. (PJH)
March 11, 2011 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 137 MOTION for Relief from Judgment or Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 3/11/11. (BP)
January 6, 2011 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Order of this Court dated September 26, 2005, rec.doc.no. 5 , pursuant to which the plaintiff was granted in forma pauperis status in the above-captioned proceeding, be and it is hereby VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED t hat the plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis herein, rec.doc.no. 2 , be and it is hereby DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff is granted thirty (30) days from the date of this Order within which to pay $248.91, the r emaining amount of the Court's filing fee. The plaintiff is advised that a failure to pay the Courts filing fee within 30 days shall result in the dismissal of the plaintiff's action without further notice from the Court.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 1/5/2011. (CMM)
December 14, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING : The 108 Ruling of the magistrate judge is affirmed. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 12/13/10. (BP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. State of LA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?