Shepherd v. Exxon Mobil Corporation et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv00509
Filed: July 17, 2006
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2009 104 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 100 MOTION for Entry of Rule 54(B) Final Judgment as to Cross-Claim of Kirby Inland Marine LP filed by SGS North America, Inc.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/15/09. (BP, )
July 7, 2009 97 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING ON MOTIONS: SGS's 84 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and the SGS 82 Motion for Rule 54 Judgment of Dismissal is DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/7/2009. (JDL, )
March 12, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SGS North America, Inc., as to the claims brought under state tort law against SGS. The court makes no disposition of the claim against Exxon Mobil or the pending motion to amend, which is currently before the magistrate judge. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/11/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shepherd v. Exxon Mobil Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?