Markel American Insurance Company v. Cockrell

Case Number: 3:2006cv00603
Filed: August 21, 2006
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT...It is ordered, adjudged and decreed, that a declaratory judgment be entered in favor of plaintiff, Markel American Insurance Company, and against defendant Sturgon L. Cockrell declaring there is no coverage under plaintiff's policy. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/31/2010. (LSM, )
November 17, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING on Motion for Summary Judgment... 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Markel American Insurance Company is granted in part and denied in part......The court grants the plaintiff's motion to extend expert deadlines. 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sturgon L. Cockrell is denied. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/17/09. (LSM, ) Modified on 11/18/2009 (LSM, ).
February 4, 2008 26 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 15 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Markel American Insurance Company for failure to join an indispensable party.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/4/08. (HCJ, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markel American Insurance Company v. Cockrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?