Howard v. Blanco et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv00612
Filed: August 24, 2006
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2011 126 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is denied, the defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is granted and the claims against defendants Larry Clark, Eugene "Pop" Hathaway, C lement LaFleur, Jr., Kenneth A. Jones, Henry W. Powel and Gov. Bobby Jindal (docs. 114 and 117) are dismissed. Summary judgment is granted in favor of Louisiana State Penitentiary Warden Burl Cain and Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections Secretary James LeBlanc and the claims against them are dismissed.Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/30/2011. (PJH)
March 30, 2010 109 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 97 Report and Recommendations, 90 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 72 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Clement LaFleur, Jr, Henry W. Powell, Larry Clark, Eugene "Pop" Hataway, Bobby Jindal , Kenneth A. Jones is granted in part, dismissing all of the plaintiff's claims which arose prior to January 30, 2005, and in all other respects the defendants' motion for summary judgment is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 3/29/10. (BP, )
December 4, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS.. It is the recommendation of the magistrate judge that the 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Clement LaFleur, Jr, Henry W. Powell, Larry Clark, Eugene "Pop" Hataway, Bobby Jindal, Kenneth A. Jones be gran ted in part, dismissing all of the plaintiff's claims which arose prior to 8/9/2005. It is further recommended that in all other respects the defendants' motion for summary judgment be denied. Objections to R&R due by 12/21/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/4/2009. (CMM, ) Modified on 12/9/2009 to edit text (NLT, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Blanco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?