Barcosh, Ltd v. Dumas et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv00616
Filed: August 24, 2006
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2010 260 Opinion or Order of the Court Garnishment Judgment granting 258 Motion for Entry of Garnishment Order. IT IS ORDERED that the clerk of court accept all payment of funds from Garnishees, and deposit them into the registry of this court to be held in an interest bearing account until further order of the court. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/11/2010. (CMM,)
August 11, 2010 259 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 253 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/11/2010. (CMM, )
January 14, 2009 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The court notifies Dumas & Associates Law Firm, LLC, as garnishee that it does not appear to be complying with the order mandating "a full accounting to the court at each date when settlements are made with Walter C. Dumas regarding any compensation owed to him, and Dumas & Associates Law Firm, L.L.C.". Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/14/09. (BP, ) Modified on 1/14/2009 to edit text (BP, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barcosh, Ltd v. Dumas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?