Montgomery v. Boutee et al

Plaintiff: Ernest Montgomery
Defendant: M Vincent, F. Boutee, T. Albright, K Guerin, D. Carrol, John Doe, R McNeil, B. Beck, E. Pedescleaux and K. Durbin
Case Number: 3:2007cv00094
Filed: February 9, 2007
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2010 171 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 170 Joint MOTION to Continue Pre-Trial schedule on 9/16/10 filed by K. Durbin, Brad Carpenter, M Vincent, D. Carrol, F. Boutee, E. Pedescleaux, R McNeil, B. Beck, K Guerin, T. Albright, Jeff Leblanc. The pretrial conference is hereby rescheduled for 10/12/2010 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/14/2010. (CMM,)
June 21, 2010 160 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING..pltf's exhibits Nos. 11, 16 and 17 shall be allowed at trial.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 06/18/10. (PAH, )
August 13, 2009 149 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 148 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 133 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by F. Boutee is denied, and this matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/12/09. (LSM, )
July 16, 2009 148 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by F. Boutee...It is recommended that the motion for Summary Judgment be denied... Objections to R&R due by 7/30/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 7/16/09. (LSM, ) Modified on 7/17/2009 (LSM, ).
June 18, 2009 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 145 Pltfs Motion to Take Action to Move Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 6/17/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montgomery v. Boutee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Boutee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Albright
Represented By: Babatunde Mobolade Animashaun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Guerin
Represented By: Babatunde Mobolade Animashaun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Carrol
Represented By: Babatunde Mobolade Animashaun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R McNeil
Represented By: Babatunde Mobolade Animashaun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Beck
Represented By: Babatunde Mobolade Animashaun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Pedescleaux
Represented By: Babatunde Mobolade Animashaun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Durbin
Represented By: Babatunde Mobolade Animashaun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?