Carter v. Cain et al

Plaintiff: Merrick Carter
Defendant: Burl Cain, C Team, D Team and Camp C
Case Number: 3:2007cv00116
Filed: February 16, 2007
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 52 Report and Recommendations, of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 54 motion by defendant, Walter Newman, to dismiss for failure to state a claim is granted and all claims asseted against Walter Newman are dismissed with prejudice and this action shall be dismissed. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 4/27/2011. (PJH)
August 11, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The court hereby approves the 49 report and recommendation of the magistrate judge and adopts it as the court's opinion herein. Accordingly, plaintiff's claims asserted against James Tyler, Curtis Celestine, "Sgt. Johnson&quo t;, "Sgt. Blackmore", "Sgt. Lewis", "Sgt. Griffin", "Sgt. Mealey", "Sgt. Gordon" and the "C-Team D-Team at Camp J, Camp C Jaguar" are dismissed for failure of the plaintiff to serve these d efendants within 120 days as mandated by Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The 30 Motion for Summary Judgment of defendants Andrea Ferguson,Johnny Howard, David Ross, Jr., James Wilkinson, Burl Cain, Newman Dupas, Eric Burkes, Loui s Boyd, Danny Bonner and Joshwa Cain is granted, dismissing the plaintiff's claims asserted against these defendants for failure of the plaintiff to exhaust administrative remedies pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e, and this matter is referred back for further proceedings relative to the plaintiff's claims asserted against the remaining defendant, Walter Newman. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 8/11/2010. (CMM,)
June 18, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Pltfs Motion for Injunctive Relief. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 6/18/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merrick Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Team
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Team
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camp C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?