Hacker v. Warden Louisiana State Penitentiary

Plaintiff: Jason Hacker
Defendant: Warden Louisiana State Penitentiary
Case Number: 3:2007cv00204
Filed: March 26, 2007
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Accordingly, the 1 the petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 is denied.. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 8/16/2010. (CMM, )
May 28, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 24 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The petitioners application for habeas corpus relief is denied as to Claims 1-4 and as to the second through fourth components of Claim 5. Further counsel shall be appoint ed to represent the petitioner, pursuant to Rule 8(c), Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, and as provided by the Criminal Justice Act, 28 USC 3006A(a)(2)(B) and an evidentiary hearing will be held on the first component of Claim 5, specifically, ineffective assistance of counsel for failure to call Eula Jackson and Joseph Jackson as witnesses at the trial. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 5/27/2009. (JDL, )
January 28, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 ... Objections to R&R due by 2/11/2009..Recommended that the petitioners application for HC relief be denied as to Claims 1-4 and as to the second through fourth components of Claim 5. Further recommended that counsel be appointed to represent the petitioner, pursuant to Rule 8(c), Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, and as provided by the Criminal Justice Act, 28 USC 3006A(a)(2)(B) and that an evidentiary hearing be held on the first component of Claim 5, specifically, ineffective assistance of counsel for failure to call Eula Jackson and Joseph Jackson as witnesses at the trial.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 01/28/09. (PAH, )
March 26, 2007 6 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER...The Clerk of Court TRANSFER the above case to Middle District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Mark L. Hornsby on 3/19/2007. (jdl) (This document filed in WDLA 3/19/2007.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hacker v. Warden Louisiana State Penitentiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Louisiana State Penitentiary
Represented By: Monisa L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?