Sandres v. State Of Louisiana Division Of Administration , Office Of Risk Management

Plaintiff: Naomi Sandres
Defendant: State Of Louisiana Division Of Administration , Office Of Risk Management
Case Number: 3:2007cv00375
Filed: May 29, 2007
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2012 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 179 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims are hereby Dismissed with Prejudice and Plaintiff shall be required to comply with the 10/16/12 Order regarding sanctions. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/12/12. (LLH)
September 7, 2012 157 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 151 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/6/2012. (JDL)
May 24, 2012 144 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 133 Motion to Dismiss as stated herein. Party(s) State Of Louisiana Division Of Administration, Office Of Risk Management terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/23/2012. (CMM)
September 23, 2011 121 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Accordingly, the motion by defendant to dismiss 67 is DENIED, and plaintiffs Motion Not To Dismiss 77 and Motion to Supplement Motion Not to Dismiss 86 are DISMISSED as moot. Accordingly, the motion by defendant to dismiss 67 is DENIE D, and plaintiffs Motion Not To Dismiss 77 and Motion to Supplement Motion Not to Dismiss 86 are DISMISSED as moot. The matter having recently been reassigned to the undersigned, plaintiffs motions to transfer or reassign the matter 90 , 93 , [ 94, 115 and motions for leave to file amended motions to transfer 95 , 97 , 98 and motion for leave to file an amended affidavit in support of transfer 96 are DISMISSED as moot. Plaintiff has failed to carry her burden of proving any of the four elements necessary to obtain the injunctive relief sought. Accordingly, plaintiffs motion for a temporary restraining order (doc. 109) and motion for a temporary injunction 111 are DENIED. Motion to Inform When [sic] Will Give Decision Concern ing Transfer or Reassignment of Case to Another Judge 92 , (2) Motion ForExplanation as to Why Answers Not given to All Motions 113 , (3) Request for Answer to Motion (doc. 114), (4) Motion to Court to Tell When More Than 12 Motions Will Be Answere d 119 , and (5) Motion For Explanation as to Why Case Has Been Dormant 120 are DISMISSED as moot. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the Order of the Magistrate Judge dated January 12, 2010 105 is hereby AFFIRMED.. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/23/2011. (CMM)
January 12, 2010 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: as to 104 Request for Case File Original Records and Certified Docket Sheets filed by Naomi Sandres. It is ordered that Request for Case File Original Records and Certified Docket Sheet is hereby denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 1/12/2010. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandres v. State Of Louisiana Division Of Administration , Office Of Risk Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Sandres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of Louisiana Division Of Administration , Office Of Risk Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?