Barousalian et al

Plaintiff: Abraham Barousalian, Maral Kloumian and Yeghia Barousalian
Defendant: City of Baton Rouge, Melvin Holden, Jeff LeDuff and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2007cv00385
Filed: June 4, 2007
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that plaintiffs, Abraham Barousalian, Maral Kloumian, and Yeghia Barousalian, suit against City of Baton Rouge, Mayor Melvin Kip Holden, Jeff LeDuff, Tillman Cox, Otis Nacoste, Robert Rachal, Lynn Ferguson, James Gewalt, Robert Schilling, Eugene Rafferty, Charles Thompson, John Thomas, Roderick McCoy, Sr., James Curts, Daniel Poe, Stephonne Lewis, Leo Keller and Gerard Bloom, is hereby DISMISSED, with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 4/22/2010. (CMM,)
November 10, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING & ORDER: 44 Second Motion for Sanctions filed by pltfs is GRANTED IN PART, in that defense counsel shall pay a monetary sanction of $350.00 in connection with this motion, and DENIED IN PART, in that the other sanctions requested by plt fs should not be imposed. Further, this amount shall be paid within 20 days from the date of this order. FURTHER ORDERED that the Court's Order of 6/2/2009 shall be complied with, also within 20 days from date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 11/10/2009. (JDL, )
June 2, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING & ORDER granting 37 the Motion to Deem Request for Admission Admitted; 38 the Motion for Sanctions and 39 the Motion to Compel Responses to Discovery, as modified in the ruling. FURTHER ORDERED that defts comply with the ruling as directed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 6/2/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barousalian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Barousalian
Represented By: John Christopher Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maral Kloumian
Represented By: John Christopher Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yeghia Barousalian
Represented By: John Christopher Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Baton Rouge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff LeDuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?