Butler v. Exxon Mobil Corporation

Plaintiff: Ben Butler
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Case Number: 3:2007cv00386
Filed: June 5, 2007
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2012 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS granting 118 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Eldon E. Fallon on 1/20/12. (ALA)
January 25, 2011 98 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 57 Motion in Limine to Exclude Defendant's Witness. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pltf's request to reopen fact discovery for the sole purpose of allowing pltf to depose Hermann is Granted. Should they so desire, pltfs will have 30 days from the date of the signing of this order to depose Mark Hermann.. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 1/25/2011. (CMM)
March 6, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting the ruling of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The ruling of the magistrate judge dated 1/13/2009 69 is AFFIRMED. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 3/6/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Exxon Mobil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Butler
Represented By: Jill Leininger Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Melanie Moreland Hartmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?