Piazza's Seafood World, LLC v. Odom

Plaintiff: Piazza's Seafood World, LLC
Defendant: Bob Odom
Counter Claimant: Bob Odom
Counter Defendant: Bob Odom
Case Number: 3:2007cv00413
Filed: June 12, 2007
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2012 151 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Both Motions 121 and 124 for Summary Judgment are DENIED. This matter will be set for pretrial conference. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/3/2012. (JDL)
December 1, 2011 118 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 71 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/30/2011. (CMM)
September 29, 2011 110 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING & ORDER granting 98 Nonparty's MOTION for Reconsideration by Magistrate Noland of Her Nondispositive Order of 8/19/2011 (doc. 98), but that, after reconsideration, the undersigned's 8/19/2011 Ruling & Order (doc. 95) is nevertheles s MAINTAINED as issued. FURTHER ORDERED that the request of pltf, Piazza's Seafood Worlk, LLC, for an award of the attorneys fees and costs that it incurred in connection with this motion for reconsideration is hereby GRANTED, and such amount is to be included in the general award of fees/costs associated with Piazzas motion to compel to be paid solely by the Department and/or its counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 9/29/2011. (JDL)
August 19, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 8/18/2011. (LSM)
October 20, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 57 Motion for Summary Judgment without prejudice to his right to revisit the issue after appropriate discovery has been conducted; denying 58 Motion for Oral Argument as moot.. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 10/20/2010. (CMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piazza's Seafood World, LLC v. Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Bob Odom
Represented By: E. John Litchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Bob Odom
Represented By: E. John Litchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Odom
Represented By: E. John Litchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Piazza's Seafood World, LLC
Represented By: Shelton Dennis Blunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?