Aertker et al v. Placid Holding Company et al

Plaintiff: W. Patrick Aertker, Jr., Betty Aertker Harwood, Deniro, L.L.C. and Southern Interests, L.L.C.
Defendant: Placid Holding Company, Placid Pipeline Company, LLC and Rosewood Refining, LLC
Case Number: 3:2007cv00473
Filed: July 6, 2007
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2012 75 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Carl J. Barbier on 9/27/12. (SEK)
June 15, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: denying 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Rosewood Refining, LLC, Placid Pipeline Company, LLC, Placid Holding Company. Signed by Judge Carl J. Barbier on 6/15/12. (SEK)
September 30, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 31 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Defts 24 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 9/29/2010. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aertker et al v. Placid Holding Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. Patrick Aertker, Jr.
Represented By: Robert G. Nida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Aertker Harwood
Represented By: Robert G. Nida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deniro, L.L.C.
Represented By: Robert G. Nida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Interests, L.L.C.
Represented By: Robert G. Nida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Placid Holding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Placid Pipeline Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosewood Refining, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?