Wagner v. BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Emily Wagner
Defendant: BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc., Franklin Collection Service, Inc., CBCS, Equifax Credit Information Services, Inc. and Trans Union, L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2007cv00604
Filed: August 21, 2007
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2012 262 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER: Defts 255 MOTION for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/24/2012. (JDL)
June 9, 2010 230 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 220 Report and Recommendations, of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, Franklin Collection Service, Inc.'s 143 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part as stated herein.. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 6/8/2010. (CMM, )
July 29, 2009 193 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 185 Motion For Depositions and Continuance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 7/29/09. (LSM, ) Modified on 7/30/2009 to edit text(LSM, ).
July 10, 2009 177 Opinion or Order of the Court Ruling granting 146 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion For Summary Judgment...Granting 149 Motion for Depositions And Continuance...Plaintiffs opposition to defendant Equifaxs motion for summary judgment shall be filed within 30 days after the transcripts of both depositions have been made available to the plaintiff. The parties shall advise the court promptly of the date the transcripts are made available.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 7/10/09. (LSM, )
February 7, 2008 39 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 32 Report and Recommendations 14 motion to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by defendant Credit Bureau Collection Service, Inc. is granted in part, dismissing the plaintiffs claims against defendant CBCS under 15 U.S.C.  67; 1692g(b) of the Fair Debt Collections Practices Act, and 15 U.S.C. §§ 1681c(c)(1) and 1681s-2(a) of the Fair Credit Reporting Act. Further dft CBCS's motion to dismiss the plaintiffs claim alleged under 15 U.S.C. § 1692e(2)(A)of the Fair Debt Collections Practices Act is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 2/7/08. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagner v. BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Collection Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBCS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Credit Information Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?