Anco Insulations, Inc. v. AIG Premier Insurance Company, a Pennsylvania corporation et al

Plaintiff: Anco Insulations, Inc.
Defendant: AIG Premier Insurance Company, Royal Indemnity Company, a Delaware corporation, Centaur Insurance Company,, Columbia Casualty Company, Continental Insurance Company, Danielson Insurance Company, a California corporation, First State Insurance Company, Holland-America Insurance Company, a Missouri corporation, Landmark Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, United States Fire Insurance Company and Westchester Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2007cv00657
Filed: September 10, 2007
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2013 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 201 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Anco Insulations, Inc.'s, and its other primary general liability insurer's, bad faith claims and request for statutory penalties under La. R.S. §§ 22: 1892 and 22: 1973 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, at Plaintiff's cost. This matter is set for pretrial conference on 4/29/2013 at 3:00 p.m., in the Chambers of Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson. As outlined herein, a written pretrial order shall be filed 10 days prior to the pretrial conference.. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 2/27/2013. (PJH)
February 11, 2011 167 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 115 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 116 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and denying 117 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Royal. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 2/10/2011. (PJH) Modified on 2/11/2011 to edit text (PJH).
November 1, 2010 166 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 112 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 120 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The claims by Anco, American Guarantee and ZAIC for reimbursement of pre-tender defense costs and fees are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/1/10. (BP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anco Insulations, Inc. v. AIG Premier Insurance Company, a Pennsylvania corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anco Insulations, Inc.
Represented By: Glen Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Premier Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Indemnity Company, a Delaware corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centaur Insurance Company,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielson Insurance Company, a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First State Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland-America Insurance Company, a Missouri corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?