Travis et al v. Laiche et al

Plaintiff: Joanne Travis and Sylvia Smith
Defendant: Jacob Laiche, Darren Ramirez and John Little
Case Number: 3:2007cv00695
Filed: September 26, 2007
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: Iberville
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The Court concludes that defts have failed to carry their burden as to qualified immunity in their 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. Because the defts have failed to offer any undisputed material facts as to pltfs "incidental claims," the Court cannot properly determine whether summary judgment is appropriate as to those claims. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/15/2009. (JDL, )
July 14, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE TO COUNSEL: as to 36 Defts MOTION for Summary Judgment. Within 10 days of this order, pltfs shall either comply with ULLR 56,2 by filing a short and concise statement of material facts, or the uncontroverted facts alleged by defts in the Statement of Undisputed Facts (doc. 36-2) will be deemed admitted for purposes of the motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/14/2009. (JDL, )
March 11, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John Little, Darren Ramirez, Jacob Laiche for failure to comply with the court's Local Rules. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/11/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travis et al v. Laiche et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Travis
Represented By: Allen J. Myles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Smith
Represented By: Allen J. Myles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Laiche
Represented By: John F. Jakuback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Ramirez
Represented By: John F. Jakuback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Little
Represented By: John F. Jakuback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?