Frick v. State of Louisiana et al

Plaintiff: Reynard Frick
Defendant: State of Louisiana, Richard L. Stalder, Cornel Hubert, Unknown Brown, Unknown Hegman and Unknown Beal
Case Number: 3:2007cv00779
Filed: October 25, 2007
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: Washington
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING : Pla failed to respond to the court's order. A review of the record showed that Judgment was entered on 5/14/09. Pla's notice of appeal was filed on 6/23/09. The record evidence showed that the pla did not deliver his notice of appeal to prison officials on or before 6/15/09. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/15/10. (BP, )
June 4, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 49 MOTION for Reconsideration of 48 Judgment filed by Reynard Frick. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/3/09. (BP, )
May 14, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 45 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 41 Motion to Dismiss is granted and this action shall be dismissed. The claims against Capt. Brown and Classification Director Beal shall be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Rule 4(m), Fed.R.Civ.P. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/14/09. (BP, )
April 20, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 41 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Unknown Hegman. It is the recommendation of the magistrate judge that the defendant's motion to dismiss be granted and this action be dismissed. It is further recommended that the claims against Capt. Brown and Classification Director Beal be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Rule 4(m), Fed.R.Civ.P. Objections to R&R due by 5/4/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 4/17/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frick v. State of Louisiana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynard Frick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Stalder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornel Hubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hegman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Beal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?