Chambers v. Stalder et al

Plaintiff: Brandon R Chambers
Defendant: Richard Stalder, Cornel Hubert, Lawrence Hall, James Johnson, E Decuir, Unknown Melchior and Donald Fields
Case Number: 3:2007cv00848
Filed: November 15, 2007
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: West Feliciana
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2011 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 113 Motion for Recusal.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/7/2011. (JDL)
August 17, 2009 82 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 80 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The pltfs claims against deft Donald Fields are dismissed for failure of pltf to serve the deft within 120 days as mandated by FRCP 4(m). Further, the 76 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by remaining defts is DENIED, and this matter is referred back to the USMJ for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 8/17/2009. (JDL, )
July 10, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 76 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by J.L. Decuir, Unknown Melchior, James Johnson. It is recommended that the plaintiffs claims against defendant Donald Fields be dismissed for failure of the plaintiff to ser ve this defendant within 120 days as mandated by Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. It is further recommended that the Motion for Summary Judgment of the remaining defendants, rec.doc.no. 76, be denied, and that this matter be referred back for further proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 7/24/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 7/10/09. (BP, )
January 5, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 61 Pltfs Motion to Compel. FURTHER ORDERED that, within 30 days of the date of this order, pltf shall provide additional information regarding the location of deft Donald Fields in order that this person may be served. Failure to provide this information may result in the dismissal of this deft without further notice from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 1/5/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. Stalder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon R Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Stalder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornel Hubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Decuir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Melchior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?