Woods v. State of Louisiana

Plaintiff: Michele Woods
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Case Number: 3:2007cv00913
Filed: November 30, 2007
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT... It is ordered adjudged and decreed that judgment be entered herein in favor of defendant, the State of Louisiana, and against the plaintiff, Michele Woods. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/7/09. (LSM, )
July 14, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/14/09. (LSM, )
May 19, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part 37 Pltfs Motion to Compel Answers and For Attorney Fees. The deft shall serve the pltf with supplemental answers and responses to interrogatories and requests for production by 5:00 PM on Monday, 5/25/2009. Pursuant to Rule 37(a)(5), within 10 days, the deft is ordered to pay the pltf $250.00. The remaining aspects of the pltfs motion are denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 5/19/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Woods
Represented By: J. Courtney Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?