Davenport et al v. Hamilton, Brown & Babst, LLC, et al

Case Number: 3:2007cv00928
Filed: December 7, 2007
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2010 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON SEPARATE MOTION TO REPLEAD: Plaintiffs shall have until November 26, 2010 to supplement their separate Motion to Replead by providing the Court with their proposed Second Amendment to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/16/10. (BP)
November 8, 2010 131 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 85 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the conversion claim; granting 87 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the twenty-five percent interest claim; granting 89 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the claim of joint vent ure; denying 90 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' claim of a twenty-five percent fee interest is dismissed. The claim asserted by plaintiffs pursuant to Louisiana's law of joint venture, is dismissed. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/8/10. (PJH)
October 25, 2010 127 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING : The 74 Ruling of the magistrate judge dated 2/25/2009 is affirmed. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 10/25/10. (BP, )
February 6, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Affirming 64 Ruling of the magistrate judge. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 2/6/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davenport et al v. Hamilton, Brown & Babst, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?