Plaisance v. Cain et al

Case Number: 3:2007cv00934
Filed: December 10, 2007
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION adopting Magistrate Judge's Report. 37 Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert Hayes, Mack Shaw, Burl Cain, Blane Lachney, Darryl Vannoy, Louisiana State Penitentiary, Shirley Coody is denied as moot and this action is dismissed. Motion for summary judgment shall is granted.. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 8/7/09. (LSM, )
July 9, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 37 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert Hayes, Mack Shaw, Burl Cain, Blane Lachney, Darryl Vannoy, Louisiana State Penitentiary, Shirley Coody. It is recommended that the defendants motion for summary judgment, re c.doc.no. 37, be granted, dismissing the plaintiffs claims for failure to exhaust administrative remedies as mandated by 42 U.S.C. § 1997e. It is further recommended that the defendants motion to dismiss be denied as moot and that this action be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 7/23/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 07/9/09. (LSM, )
March 18, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Pltfs Motion Ordering Defts to Pay Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 3/18/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plaisance v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?