Georgia-Pacific LLC v. Heavy Machines, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2007cv00944
Filed: December 12, 2007
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 72 MOTION For Entry of Final Judgment. The Court's ruling granting partial summary judgment is designated a final, appealable judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the FRCP. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/1/10. (BP, ) Modified on 6/1/2010 to edit document type(BP, ).
May 20, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 74 MOTION for Reconsideration of 71 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/20/10. (BP, )
March 1, 2010 70 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING ON APPEAL : Magistrate Riedlinger's Ruling of 1/22/2010 59 is overruled. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/1/10. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Georgia-Pacific LLC v. Heavy Machines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?