Jeanlouis v. State of Louisiana et al
Plaintiff: Gregory J. Jeanlouis
Defendant: Unknown Escue, Bruce Dodd, Dr. Unknown Cadwell, James Bueche, Unknown Duporte, Sheryl L. Ranatza, Unknown White, Shirley Coody, Connie Moore, Jimmy Leblanc, Doctor Unknown Pregean, Dr. Unknown Piddy, Unknown Howard, Clayton Williams, Unknown Benjamin, Raymond McNeil, Kristy Johnson, Richard Stalder, 19th JDC, Clerk of Court Office Deputy Clerks, U.S. Post Office (Angola), Deputy Unknown Dykes, Unknown Wackespack, Gary Midkiff, Dr. Unknown Singh, Unknown Quiet, Unknown McKey, Barbara Unknown, Cornell Hubert, John Does, Unknown Stagg, Charlene Haydel, Darrell Vannoy, Jane Does, Unknown Barr, Lora Rodrigue, Kathleen Blanco, LSP Mail Room, Christina Honeycutt, Melina Meiner, Unknown McKay, Charles Darborne, Doug Welborn, Howard Price, John Doe Johnson, Dr. Unknown Slyvester, M.D. William Cassidy, Dr. William Cassidy, Unknown Drew, LSP Disiplinary Appeal Office, Louisiana State Penitentary (LSP) ARP Office, Stephanie Michel, Linda Ramsey, Col. Unknown Stewart, Randall Robertson, United States District Court, Middle District of Louisiana Clerk Office Deputy Clerks, Mary Bail, Ken August, Dr. Unknown Reinbow, Unknown Butler, Trish Foster, Shar Huffman, Unknown Roundtree, Tom Desporte, Unknown Ferguson, Danny Williams, Unknown Griffen, Amy Sterlings, Burl Cain, John Calvert, Unknown Sharp, Delilah Delee, Dr. Mia Tran, Reginald Ladmirault, Susan Byargeon, Wanda Matthews, Jane Doe, Unknown Simmions, Unknown Crump, Kathy Calvert, Unknown McGee, Eddie R. Pendoarie, John Shaw, John Dwayne, Unknown Thompson, Louisiana State Penitentary LSP Office, D Major, State of Louisiana, Unknown Lanchney and John Jacobs, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2008cv00021
Filed: January 9, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: Christine Noland
Referring Judge: Frank J Polozola
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2014 Confirmation of receipt of payment from GREGORY JEANLOUIS in the amount of $38.33. Transaction posted on 9/29/2014. Receipt number LAMDDC1161 processed by Finance Import. (NLT ADI, )
August 13, 2014 Confirmation of receipt of payment from GREGORY JEANLOUIS in the amount of $60. Transaction posted on 8/12/2014. Receipt number LAMDDC1135 processed by Finance Import. (NLT ADI, )
December 2, 2013 Confirmation of receipt of payment from GREGORY JEANLOUIS in the amount of $20. Transaction posted on 11/26/2013. Receipt number LAMDDC974 processed by Finance Import. (NLT ADI, )
October 24, 2013 Confirmation of receipt of payment from GREGORY JEANLOUIS in the amount of $50. Transaction posted on 10/24/2013. Receipt number LAMDDC851 processed by Finance Import. (NLT ADI, )
September 25, 2013 Confirmation of receipt of payment from GREGORY JEANLOUIS in the amount of $30. Transaction posted on 9/25/2013. Receipt number LAMDDC831 processed by Finance Import. (NLT ADI, )
August 15, 2013 Confirmation of receipt of payment from GREGORY JEANLOUIS in the amount of $32. Transaction posted on 8/13/2013. Receipt number LAMDDC810 processed by Finance Import. (NLT ADI, )
July 24, 2013 Confirmation of receipt of payment from GREG JEANLOUIS in the amount of $20. Transaction posted on 7/18/2013. Receipt number LAMDDC792 processed by Finance Import. (NLT ADI, )
June 17, 2013 Confirmation of receipt of payment from GREGORY JEANLOUIS in the amount of $20. Transaction posted on 6/14/2013. Receipt number LAMDDC775 processed by Finance Import. (NLT ADI, )
May 17, 2013 Confirmation of receipt of payment from GREGORY JEANLOUIS in the amount of $20. Transaction posted on 5/17/2013. Receipt number LAMDDC755 processed by Finance Import. (NLT ADI, )
April 15, 2013 Confirmation of receipt of payment from GREGORY JEANLOUIS in the amount of $40. Transaction posted on 4/12/2013. Receipt number LAMDDC733 processed by Finance Import. (NLT ADI, )
July 21, 2010 Filing 90 MANDATE of USCA as to #84 Notice of Appeal filed by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. Appeal dismissed as of 7/15/10 pursuant to appellant's motion. (BP, )
June 18, 2010 Filing 89 NOTICE to inform the Court of dfts' failure to comply with court order by Gregory J. Jeanlouis (BP, )
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER: #85 Pltfs Motion for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED, without prejudice to re-assertion in the court of appeals. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 6/18/2010. (JDL, ) (Main Document 88 replaced on 6/18/2010) (JDL, ).
June 3, 2010 Filing 87 USCA Case Number 10-30484 for #84 Notice of Appeal filed by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (NLT)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that, within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, the plaintiff shall submit to this Court either $455.00 (the full amount of the applicable appellate filing fee) or a properly completed motion to proceed as a pauper on appeal pursuant to Rule 24(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure (copy attached), together with a properly completed Statement of Account (copy attached), signed by an authorized officer of the institution, certifying to the average six month deposits and balance in the plaintiffs inmate account(s)... Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 05/27/10. (PAH, )
May 26, 2010 Filing 85 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (BP, )
May 26, 2010 Filing 84 NOTICE OF APPEAL of #80 Judgment, by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (CMM, )
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying #81 to Alter or Amend March 31, 2010 80 Judgment by Gregory J. Jeanlouis.. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 4/28/2010. (CMM, )
April 19, 2010 Filing 82 Objection to #79 OPINION filed by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (BP, )
April 14, 2010 Motions No Longer Referred: #81 MOTION to Amend #80 Judgment,,,,. This motion is now pending before the USDJ. (CMM, )
April 14, 2010 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #81 MOTION to Amend #80 Judgment,,,,. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (CMM, )
April 14, 2010 Filing 81 MOTION to Alter or Amend March 31, 2010 #80 Judgment by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (CMM, ) (Main Document 81 replaced on 4/23/2010) (CMM, ).
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 JUDGMENT...It is ordered that the defendants' motion for summary judgment shall be granted, dismissing the pla's claims against the moving dfts, without prejudice, as a result of the pla's failure to exhaust administrative remedies as mandated by 42 U.S.C. 1997e, but with prejudice to his refiling the same claim in forma pauperis. It is further recommended that the pla's claims asserted against the remaining state-employed dfts shall be similarly dismissed for failure to exhaust administrative remedies (again with prejudice to refiling in forma pauperis) and/or as legally frivolous within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. 1915, and that the pla's claims asserted against the U.S. Postal Service and U.S. Middle District Clerk of Court Nick Lorio be dismissed, with prejudice, as legally frivolous. It is further ordered that the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the pla's state law claims, and that this action shall be dismissed. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 3/31/2010. (LSM, )
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 OPINION Adopting #29 Motion for Summary Judgment,, filed by Darrell Vannoy, Linda Ramsey, Howard Price, Reginald Ladmirault, Mia Tran, Cornell Hubert, Bruce Dodd, Amy Sterlings, Trish Foster, Shar Huffman, Stephanie Michel, John Jacobs, Jr., Wanda Matthews, Ken August, Burl Cain, Sheryl Ranatza, Raymond McNeil, Randall Robertson, Jimmy Leblanc, Tom Desporte, Clayton Williams, Shirley Coody, Charlene Haydel, Kathy Calvert, Gary Midkiff, John Calvert, #77 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. It is ordered that the defendants' motion for summary judgment shall be granted, dismissing the pla's claims against the moving dfts, without prejudice, as a result of the pla's failure to exhaust administrative remedies as mandated by 42 U.S.C. 1997e, but with prejudice to his refiling the same claim in forma pauperis. It is further recommended that the pla's claims asserted against the remaining state-employed dfts shall be similarly dismissed for failure to exhaust administrative remedies (again with prejudice to refiling in forma pauperis) and/or as legally frivolous within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. 1915, and that the pla's claims asserted against the U.S. Postal Service and U.S. Middle District Clerk of Court Nick Lorio be dismissed, with prejudice, as legally frivolous. It is further ordered that the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the pla's state law claims, and that this action shall be dismissed. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 3/31/2010. (LSM, )
March 17, 2010 Filing 78 OBJECTION to #77 Report and Recommendations filed by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (LSM, )
March 4, 2010 Filing 77 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Darrell Vannoy, Linda Ramsey, Howard Price, Reginald Ladmirault, Mia Tran, Cornell Hubert, Bruce Dodd, Amy Sterlings, Trish Foster, Shar Huffman, Stephanie Michel, John Jacobs, Jr., Wanda Matthews, Ken August, Burl Cain, Sheryl Ranatza, Raymond McNeil, Randall Robertson, Jimmy Leblanc, Tom Desporte, Clayton Williams, Shirley Coody, Charlene Haydel, Kathy Calvert, Gary Midkiff, John Calvert. It is recommended that the defendants' motion for summary judgment be granted, dismissing the pla's claims against the moving dfts, without prejudice, as a result of the pla's failure to exhaust administrative remedies as mandated by 42 U.S.C. 1997e, but with prejudice to his refiling the same claim in forma pauperis. It is further recommended that the pla's claims asserted against the remaining state-employed dfts be similarly dismissed for failure to exhaust administrative remedies (again with prejudice to refiling in forma pauperis) and/or as legally frivolous within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. 1915, and that the pla's claims asserted against the U.S. Postal Service and U.S. Middle District Clerk of Court Nick Lorio be dismissed, with prejudice, as legally frivolous. Finally, it is recommended that the Court decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the pla's state law claims, and that this action be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 3/22/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 3/4/10. (BP, )
January 26, 2010 Filing 76 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE regarding #75 Order,, Set Deadlines, #66 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, filed by Ken August, Burl Cain, John Calvert, Kathy Calvert, Shirley Coody, Tom Desporte, Bruce Dodd, Trish Foster, Charlene Haydel, Shar Huffman, Stephanie Michel, Gary Midkiff, Howard Price, Linda Ramsey, Sheryl Ranatza, Randall Robertson, Amy Sterlings, Mia Tran, Darrell Vannoy, Clayton Williams. (Seng, Annette)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that, within 15 days of the date of this Order, the defendants shall file with the Court their supplemental memorandum or, within such time, shall appear and show cause, in writing, why sanctions should not be imposed for their failure to comply with the Court's Orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 1/11/2010. (CMM,)
November 18, 2009 Filing 74 Mail Returned as Undeliverable on #73 USCA Mandate. Mail returned from Gregory J. Jeanlouis. Reason: Refused. (PAH, )
November 2, 2009 Filing 73 MANDATE of USCA as to #64 Notice of Appeal filed by Gregory J. Jeanlouis..The appeal is dismissed for want of prosecution. The appellant failed to timely pay docketing fee. (PAH, )
October 28, 2009 Filing 72 NOTICE of Compliance by Jimmy Leblanc to #66 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5)(Seng, Annette)
September 3, 2009 Filing 71 USCA Case Number 09-30746 for #64 Notice of Appeal filed by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (CMM, )
September 3, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry) Brief due by 10/20/2009. (CMM, )
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to Court's Order #66 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants are granted an extension of time of forty five (45) days to file the additional APR requests ordered by the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that after the additional ARP responses are filed, defendants are granted an extension of time of an additional forty five (45) days to file their supplemental memorandum regarding the applicability, or lack thereof, of the additional ARPs to plaintiffs complaint.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 9/3/2009. (CMM, )
September 1, 2009 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #69 MOTION for Extension of Time to FILe Responses to Court's Order (rec.doc.66) MOTION for Extension of Time to FILe Responses to Court's Order (rec.doc.66). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (CMM, )
September 1, 2009 Filing 69 MOTION for Extension of Time to FILe Responses to Court's Order (rec.doc.66) by Sheryl Ranatza, Gary Midkiff, Stephanie Michel, Raymond McNeil, Charlene Haydel, Ken August, Wanda Matthews, Burl Cain, Darrell Vannoy, Howard Price, John Calvert, Bruce Dodd, Trish Foster, Shar Huffman, Clayton Williams, Reginald Ladmirault, Kathy Calvert, Randall Robertson, John Jacobs, Jr, Linda Ramsey, Amy Sterlings, Cornell Hubert, Shirley Coody, Tom Desporte. (Seng, Annette)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #67 Motion to Withdraw Notice of Appeal. IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiffs motion be and it is hereby GRANTED, and the plaintiff is allowed to withdraw his interlocutory appeal in this case.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 9/1/2009. (CMM, )
August 27, 2009 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #67 MOTION to Withdraw. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (CMM, )
August 27, 2009 Filing 67 MOTION to Withdraw Plaintiff's #64 Notice of Appeal, Order of August 11, 2009, #65 by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (CMM, ) (CMM, ).
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, the defendants shall supplement the record with certified copies of the plaintiffs administrative remedy proceedings as stated herein..IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, the defendants shall file a supplemental memorandum addressing the applicability or inapplicability of these additional grievances to the plaintiffs claims, after which the plaintiff shall have ten (10) days to file a memorandum in opposition or in response thereto.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 8/26/2009. (CMM, )
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that, within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order, the plaintiff shall submit to this Court either $455.00 (the full amount of the applicable appellate filing fee) or a properly completed motion to proceed as a pauper on appeal pursuant to Rule 24(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure (copy attached), together with a properly completed Statement of Account (copy attached), signed by an authorized officer of the institution, certifying to the average six month deposits and balance in the plaintiffs inmate account(s).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 8/11/2009. (CMM, )
August 10, 2009 Filing 64 NOTICE OF APPEAL of #60 Opinion, by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NLT, )
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiffs #59 motion be and it is hereby GRANTED, and the plaintiff is allowed to withdraw his appeal in this case.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 7/29/2009. (CMM, ) Modified on 8/3/2009 (CMM, ).
July 27, 2009 Filing 62 Exception/Objection to Judge Polozola's Opinion to #61 Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion,, filed by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (CMM, )
July 23, 2009 Filing 61 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support of #48 Order,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sheryl Ranatza, Gary Midkiff, Stephanie Michel, Raymond McNeil, Charlene Haydel, Ken August, Wanda Matthews, Burl Cain, Darrell Vannoy, Howard Price, John Calvert, Bruce Dodd, Trish Foster, Shar Huffman, Mia Tran, Clayton Williams, Reginald Ladmirault, Jimmy Leblanc, Kathy Calvert, Randall Robertson, John Jacobs, Jr, Linda Ramsey, Amy Sterlings, Cornell Hubert, Shirley Coody, Tom Desporte. (Seng, Annette)
July 15, 2009 Filing 60 OPINION granting #30 MOTION to Dismiss of Doug Welborn, the State of Louisiana, the LSP ARP Office, the LSP Disciplinary Appeal Office, and the LSP Mailroom shall be granted, dismissing the plaintiffs claims against these defendants, with prejudice, and this matter shall be referred back to the undersigned for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 7/15/09. (CMM, )
July 9, 2009 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #59 MOTION to Withdraw. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (CMM, )
July 9, 2009 Filing 59 MOTION to Withdraw Plaintiff's Notice of Intent to Appeal, Rec. doc. No. 42, Order of June 18, 2009 Rec. doc. 55 by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (CMM, )
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 IT IS ORDERED that, within fifteen (15) days of the date of this Order, the defendants shall file their supplemental memorandum in support of the pending motion for summary judgment or shall appear, in writing, and show cause why appropriate sanctions should not be imposed for their failure to do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 7/9/09. (CMM, )
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying #56 MOTION for Leave Of Stay On Proceedings To Seek Writ Of Court's Ruling Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Appointment Of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 07/9/09. (CMM, )
June 23, 2009 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #56 MOTION for Leave to Of Stay Of Proceedings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (CMM, )
June 23, 2009 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave Of Stay On Proceedings To Seek Writ Of Court's Ruling Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Appointment Of Counsel. by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (CMM, )
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order, the plaintiff shall submit to this Court either $455.00 (the full amount of the applicable appellate filing fee) or a properly completed motion to proceed as a pauper on appeal pursuant to Rule 24(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure (copy attached), together with a properly completed Statement of Account (copy attached), signed by an authorized officer of the institution, certifying to the average six-month deposits and balance in the plaintiffs inmate account(s).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 06/18/09. (LSM, )
June 10, 2009 Filing 54 RULING denying #52 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 6/10/2009. (NLT, )
June 4, 2009 Filing 53 OBJECTION to #49 Defts Notice of Compliance filed by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (JDL, )
June 4, 2009 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #52 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JDL, )
June 4, 2009 Filing 52 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (JDL, )
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Memorandum. Defts given 15 days extension to file supplemental memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 5/19/2009. (JDL, )
May 18, 2009 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #50 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Memorandum. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JDL, )
May 18, 2009 Motions terminated: #50 MOTION to Adopt #48 Order. This motion is terminated because this was not a two-part motion. (JDL, )
May 18, 2009 Filing 50 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Memorandum by Sheryl Ranatza, Gary Midkiff, Stephanie Michel, Raymond McNeil, Charlene Haydel, Ken August, Wanda Matthews, Burl Cain, Darrell Vannoy, Howard Price, John Calvert, Bruce Dodd, Trish Foster, Shar Huffman, Mia Tran, Clayton Williams, Reginald Ladmirault, Jimmy Leblanc, Kathy Calvert, Randall Robertson, John Jacobs, Jr, Linda Ramsey, Amy Sterlings, Cornell Hubert, Shirley Coody, Tom Desporte. (Seng, Annette) Modified on 5/19/2009 to correct title of document (JDL, ).
May 18, 2009 Filing 49 NOTICE of Compliance by Sheryl Ranatza, Gary Midkiff, Stephanie Michel, Raymond McNeil, Charlene Haydel, Ken August, Wanda Matthews, Burl Cain, Darrell Vannoy, Howard Price, John Calvert, Bruce Dodd, Trish Foster, Shar Huffman, Mia Tran, Clayton Williams, Reginald Ladmirault, Jimmy Leblanc, Kathy Calvert, Randall Robertson, John Jacobs, Jr, Linda Ramsey, Amy Sterlings, Cornell Hubert, Shirley Coody, Tom Desporte to #48 Order,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Debbie Ramirez, #2 Exhibit ARP# EHCC-2006-1635, #3 Exhibit ARP# ECHH-2006-1591, #4 Exhibit ARP# ECHH-2005-717, #5 Exhibit ARP# ECHH-2007-470, #6 Exhibit ARP# ECHH-2007-170, #7 Exhibit Affidavit of Trish Foster, #8 Exhibit ARP# LSP-2001-3688, #9 Exhibit ARP# LSP-2004-2975, pt 1, #10 Exhibit ARP# LSP-2004-0975,pt 2, #11 Exhibit ARP# LSP-2007-1394, #12 Exhibit ARP# LSP-2007-2909, #13 Exhibit ARP# LSP-2008-1198, pt 1, #14 Exhibit ARP# LSP-2008-1198, pt 2, #15 Exhibit ARP# LSP-2007-0540W, pt. 1, #16 Exhibit ARP# LSP-2007-0540W, pt. 2)(Seng, Annette)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: Within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order, the defendants shall supplement the record with certified copies of the plaintiffs administrative grievances nos. EHCC-2005-717, EHCC-2006-1635, EHCC-2006-1591, EHCC-2007-170, EHCC-2007-470, LSP-2001-3688, LSP-2004-0475, LSP-2004-0975, LSP-2007-044-W, LSP-2007-0540-W, LSP-2007-1394, LSP-2007-2909 and LSP-2008-1198 (and provide the plaintiff with a copy of same). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order, the defendants shall file a supplemental memorandum addressing the applicability or inapplicability of the additional grievances to the plaintiffs claims, after which the plaintiff shall have ten (10) days to file a memorandum in opposition or in response thereto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 4/24/2009. (NLT, )
April 24, 2009 Filing 47 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Doug Welborn, #30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LSP Mail Room, Louisiana State Penitentary (LSP) ARP Office, LSP Disiplinary Appeal Office, State of Louisiana...It is recommended that the motions to dismiss of Doug Welborn, the State of Louisiana, the LSP ARP Office, the LSP Disciplinary Appeal Office, and the LSP Mailroom, rec.doc.nos. 19 and 30, be granted, dismissing the plaintiffs claims against these defendants, with prejudice, and that this matter be referred back to the undersigned for further proceedings... Objections to R&R due by 5/8/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 4/24/2009. (NLT, )
March 27, 2009 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (NLT, )
March 27, 2009 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (NLT, )
March 27, 2009 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (NLT, )
March 27, 2009 Filing 43 RESPONSE to #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (NLT, )
March 20, 2009 Filing 42 RESPONSE/Objection with Intent to Appeal the #36 Order on Motion to Stay filed by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (NLT, )
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying as premature #40 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 3/18/2009. (NLT, )
March 11, 2009 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #40 MOTION to Compel. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT, )
March 11, 2009 Filing 40 Objection and Second MOTION to Compel by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (NLT, )
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiffs motions for extension of time, rec.doc.nos. 27, 28 and 34, be and they are hereby DENIED. The plaintiff shall file his oppositions to the pending motion to dismiss and motions for summary judgment within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 3/5/2009. (NLT, )
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying #31 Motion for Leave to Appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 3/5/2009. (NLT, )
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying as premature #32 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 3/5/2009. (NLT, )
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying #33 Motion to Stay of Leave of Proceeding to Compel the United States Marshal to Serve the (Remaining) Defendant(s) Wherever Found. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 3/5/2009. (NLT, )
February 20, 2009 Filing 35 NOTICE of Compliance by Sheryl Ranatza, Gary Midkiff, Stephanie Michel, Raymond McNeil, Charlene Haydel, Ken August, Wanda Matthews, Burl Cain, Darrell Vannoy, Howard Price, John Calvert, Bruce Dodd, Trish Foster, Shar Huffman, Mia Tran, Clayton Williams, Reginald Ladmirault, Jimmy Leblanc, Kathy Calvert, Randall Robertson, John Jacobs, Jr, Linda Ramsey, Amy Sterlings, Cornell Hubert, LSP Disiplinary Appeal Office(John Does and Jane Does), Louisiana State Penitentary (LSP) ARP Office, LSP Mail Room, Shirley Coody, Tom Desporte to #5 Order for Service by USM (Prisoner), Order for Service by USM (Prisoner), Order for Service by USM (Prisoner) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1, Part 2, #3 Exhibit 1, Part 3, #4 Exhibit 1, Part 4, #5 Exhibit 1, Part 5, #6 Exhibit 1, Part 6, #7 Exhibit 1, Part 7, #8 Exhibit 1, Part 8)(Seng, Annette)
February 20, 2009 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #30 MOTION to Dismiss. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (PAH, )
February 20, 2009 Filing 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #30 MOTION to Dismiss by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (PAH, )
February 13, 2009 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #33 MOTION to Stay. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT, )
February 13, 2009 Filing 33 MOTION to Stay of Leave of Proceeding to Compel the United States Marshal to Serve the (Remaining) Defendant(s) Wherever Found by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (NLT, )
February 11, 2009 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #32 MOTION to Compel. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT, )
February 11, 2009 Filing 32 MOTION to Compel by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NLT, )
February 5, 2009 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appeal by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (NLT, )
February 5, 2009 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #30 MOTION to Dismiss. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT, )
February 5, 2009 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss by State of Louisiana, LSP Disciplinary Appeal Office(John Does and Jane Does), Louisiana State Penitentiary (LSP) ARP Office, LSP Mail Room. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Seng, Annette)
February 4, 2009 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT, )
February 4, 2009 Filing 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Sheryl Ranatza, Gary Midkiff, Stephanie Michel, Raymond McNeil, Charlene Haydel, Ken August, Wanda Matthews, Burl Cain, Darrell Vannoy, Howard Price, John Calvert, Bruce Dodd, Trish Foster, Shar Huffman, Mia Tran, Clayton Williams, Reginald Ladmirault, Jimmy Leblanc, Kathy Calvert, Randall Robertson, John Jacobs, Jr, Linda Ramsey, Amy Sterlings, Cornell Hubert, Shirley Coody, Tom Desporte. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Affidavit of Trish Foster, #3 Attachment Attachment A to Exhibit 1, #4 Attachment Attachment B to Exhibit 1, #5 Attachment Attachment C to Exhibit 1, #6 Statement of Undisputed Facts)(Seng, Annette) Modified on 8/13/2009 (CMM, ).
January 29, 2009 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #19 MOTION to Dismiss. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT, )
January 29, 2009 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #19 MOTION to Dismiss by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (NLT, )
January 27, 2009 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #19 MOTION to Dismiss. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT, )
January 27, 2009 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #19 MOTION to Dismiss by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (NLT, )
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying #14 Motion for Protective Order to Compel USMS to comply with Pltfs request. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 1/27/2009. (JDL, )
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Sheryl Ranatza answer due 1/23/2009; Gary Midkiff answer due 1/23/2009; Stephanie Michel answer due 1/23/2009; Raymond McNeil answer due 1/23/2009; Charlene Haydel answer due 1/23/2009; Ken August answer due 1/23/2009; Wanda Matthews answer due 1/23/2009; State of Louisiana answer due 1/23/2009; Burl Cain answer due 1/23/2009; Darrell Vannoy answer due 1/23/2009; Howard Price answer due 1/23/2009; John Calvert answer due 1/23/2009; Bruce Dodd answer due 1/23/2009; Trish Foster answer due 1/23/2009; Shar Huffman answer due 1/23/2009; Clayton Williams answer due 1/23/2009; Reginald Ladmirault answer due 1/23/2009; Kathy Calvert answer due 1/23/2009; Randall Robertson answer due 1/23/2009; John Jacobs, Jr answer due 1/23/2009; Linda Ramsey answer due 1/23/2009; Amy Sterlings answer due 1/23/2009; Louisiana State Penitentary LSP Office answer due 1/23/2009; Cornell Hubert answer due 1/23/2009; LSP Disiplinary Appeal Office(John Does and Jane Does) answer due 1/23/2009; Louisiana State Penitentary (LSP) ARP Office answer due 1/23/2009; LSP Mail Room answer due 1/23/2009; Shirley Coody answer due 1/23/2009; Tom Desporte answer due 1/23/2009.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 1/9/2009. (NLT, )
January 7, 2009 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT, )
January 7, 2009 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint by Sheryl Ranatza, Gary Midkiff, Stephanie Michel, Raymond McNeil, Charlene Haydel, Ken August, Wanda Matthews, Burl Cain, Darrell Vannoy, Howard Price, John Calvert, Bruce Dodd, Trish Foster, Shar Huffman, Clayton Williams, Reginald Ladmirault, Kathy Calvert, Randall Robertson, John Jacobs, Jr, Linda Ramsey, Amy Sterlings, Cornell Hubert, LSP Disiplinary Appeal Office(John Does and Jane Does), Louisiana State Penitentary (LSP) ARP Office, LSP Mail Room, Shirley Coody, Tom Desporte. (Seng, Annette)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Pltfs Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #19 MOTION to Dismiss. Pltf has 45 days from the date hereof to file his response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 12/15/2008. (JDL, )
December 12, 2008 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #19 MOTION to Dismiss. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT, ) Modified on 12/12/2008 to edit file date (NLT, ).
December 12, 2008 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #19 MOTION to Dismiss by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (NLT, ) Modified on 12/12/2008 to edit file date (NLT, ).
December 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Sheryl Ranatza answer due 1/8/2009; Gary Midkiff answer due 1/8/2009; Stephanie Michel answer due 1/8/2009; Raymond McNeil answer due 1/8/2009; Charlene Haydel answer due 1/8/2009; Ken August answer due 1/8/2009; Wanda Matthews answer due 1/8/2009; State of Louisiana answer due 1/8/2009; Burl Cain answer due 1/8/2009; Darrell Vannoy answer due 1/8/2009; Howard Price answer due 1/8/2009; John Calvert answer due 1/8/2009; Bruce Dodd answer due 1/8/2009; Trish Foster answer due 1/8/2009; Shar Huffman answer due 1/8/2009; Clayton Williams answer due 1/8/2009; Reginald Ladmirault answer due 1/8/2009; Kathy Calvert answer due 1/8/2009; Randall Robertson answer due 1/8/2009; John Jacobs, Jr answer due 1/8/2009; Linda Ramsey answer due 1/8/2009; Amy Sterlings answer due 1/8/2009; Cornell Hubert answer due 1/8/2009; LSP Disiplinary Appeal Office(John Does and Jane Does) answer due 1/8/2009; Louisiana State Penitentary (LSP) ARP Office answer due 1/8/2009; LSP Mail Room answer due 1/8/2009; Shirley Coody answer due 1/8/2009; Tom Desporte answer due 1/8/2009.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 12/9/2008. (NLT, )
December 3, 2008 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint. This motion is now pending before the United States Magistrate Judge. (NLT, )
December 3, 2008 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint by Sheryl Ranatza, Gary Midkiff, Stephanie Michel, Raymond McNeil, Charlene Haydel, Ken August, Wanda Matthews, Burl Cain, Darrell Vannoy, Howard Price, John Calvert, Bruce Dodd, Trish Foster, Shar Huffman, Mia Tran, Clayton Williams, Reginald Ladmirault, Kathy Calvert, Randall Robertson, John Jacobs, Jr, Linda Ramsey, Amy Sterlings, Cornell Hubert, LSP Disiplinary Appeal Office(John Does and Jane Does), Louisiana State Penitentary (LSP) ARP Office, LSP Mail Room, Shirley Coody, Tom Desporte. (Seng, Annette)
November 24, 2008 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Doug Welborn. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Order)(Cody, Jeffery)
November 18, 2008 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. Sheryl Ranatza served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; Gary Midkiff served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; Stephanie Michel served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; Raymond McNeil served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; Charlene Haydel served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; Ken August served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; Wanda Matthews served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; Burl Cain served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; Darrell Vannoy served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; Howard Price served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; John Calvert served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; Bruce Dodd served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; Trish Foster served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; Shar Huffman served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; Mia Tran served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; Clayton Williams served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; Reginald Ladmirault served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; Jimmy Leblanc served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; Kathy Calvert served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; Randall Robertson served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; John Jacobs, Jr served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; Linda Ramsey served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; Amy Sterlings served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; Louisiana State Penitentary LSP Office served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; Cornell Hubert served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; LSP Disiplinary Appeal Office(John Does and Jane Does) served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; Louisiana State Penitentary (LSP) ARP Office served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; LSP Mail Room served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; Shirley Coody served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008; Tom Desporte served on 10/21/2008, answer due 11/10/2008. (US Marshal, )
November 18, 2008 Filing 17 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Gregory J. Jeanlouis as to John Dwayne, Danny Williams, Jane Doe, Mary Bail, Unknown Howard, Unknown Quiet, Unknown Cadwell, Raymond McNeil, Unknown Pregean, Unknown Wackespack, John Does(Classification Officers), Lora Rodrigue, John Does(Elayn Hunt Corr. Cnt. ARP Office), Jane Does, Unknown White, Unknown Stewart, Unknown Crump, Unknown Ferguson, Unknown Drew, Unknown Escue, Unknown Dykes, John Doe(First Aid Respondent), Unknown Lanchney, Unknown Duporte, Unknown Butler, Unknown Benjamin, Unknown Stagg, Unknown Singh, Unknown Barr, Unknown Piddy, Unknown Slyvester, Unknown Roundtree, Susan Byargeon, Delilah Delee, Unknown Reinbow, Kristy Johnson, Unknown Thompson, Barbara Unknown, Unknown McKay, Unknown McGee, Melina Meiner, D Major, Unknown McKey, Charles Darborne, Unknown Sharp, Christina Honeycutt, John Doe(HCPH 12, EMT Department), Jane Doe(HCP H N/A, EMT Department), Unknown Simmions, Unknown Griffen, William Cassidy. (US Marshal, )
November 4, 2008 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. Doug Welborn served on 11/3/2008, answer due 11/24/2008; 19th JDC, Clerk of Court Office Deputy Clerks served on 11/3/2008, answer due 11/24/2008. (US Marshal, )
October 15, 2008 Filing 15 Letter dated 10/7/08 from Gregory Jeanlouis to CN Re: Memo received from USM dated 10/1/08. (BP, )
October 15, 2008 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #14 MOTION to Compel. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (BP, )
October 15, 2008 Filing 14 MOTION for Protective Order to Compel USM Service... by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (BP, )
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 MOTION for Extension of Time for an Appropriate Period for the U.S. Marshal Service to Serve Upon the Dfts the Summons and Complaint and plaintiff is allowed an extension of forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order to complete the paperwork to enable the U.S. Marshals to serve defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 9/18/08. (BP, )
September 16, 2008 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Extension of Time. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (BP, )
September 16, 2008 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time for an Appropriate Period for the U.S. Marshal Service to Serve Upon the Dfts the Summons and Complaint by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(BP, )
August 8, 2008 Filing 11 RULING denying #10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 08/08/08. (PAH, )
July 30, 2008 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (BP, )
July 30, 2008 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (BP, )
July 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Indefinitely. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 7/22/08. (BP, )
June 23, 2008 MOTION REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Stay. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JDL, )
June 20, 2008 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Indefinitely by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (JDL, )
June 19, 2008 Filing fee: $ 19.67, receipt number 9690 (JDL, )
June 18, 2008 Filing 7 RECORD of Administrative Proceedings. (Attachments: #1 ARP)(Kline, William)
June 5, 2008 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Sheryl Ranatza, Gary Midkiff, John Dwayne, Danny Williams, Mary Bail, Unknown Howard, Unknown Quiet, Unknown Cadwell, Connie Moore, Stephanie Michel, Raymond McNeil, Charlene Haydel, Ken August, Unknown Pregean, Unknown Wackespack, Lora Rodrigue, Wanda Matthews, Unknown White, Unknown Stewart, Unknown Crump, Unknown Ferguson, Unknown Drew, Unknown Escue, Unknown Dykes, John Doe(First Aid Respondent), State of Louisiana, Burl Cain, Darrell Vannoy, Howard Price, Unknown Lanchney, Unknown Duporte, John Calvert, Unknown Butler, Unknown Benjamin, Unknown Stagg, Kathleen Blanco, Bruce Dodd, William Cassidy, Trish Foster, Shar Huffman, Unknown Singh, Unknown Barr, Mia Tran, Unknown Piddy, Unknown Slyvester, Unknown Roundtree, Richard Stalder, Susan Byargeon, Delilah Delee, Clayton Williams, Unknown Reinbow, Kristy Johnson, Unknown Thompson, Barbara Unknown, Unknown McKay, Reginald Ladmirault, Jimmy Leblanc, Unknown McGee, Kathy Calvert, Melina Meiner, D Major, Unknown McKey, Charles Darborne, Randall Robertson, Unknown Sharp, John Jacobs, Jr, Eddie R. Pendoarie, Linda Ramsey, Amy Sterlings, Christina Honeycutt, Jane Doe(HCP H N/A, EMT Department), Unknown Simmions, Unknown Griffen, Louisiana State Penitentary LSP Office, Cornell Hubert, LSP Disiplinary Appeal Office(John Does and Jane Does), John Shaw, Louisiana State Penitentary (LSP) ARP Office, James Bueche, LSP Mail Room, Doug Welborn, Shirley Coody, Tom Desporte. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: #1 Summons for 19th JDC, #2 Summons Issued for DOC, #3 Additional DOC Defts to serve)(JDL, )
May 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER...USM is to serve the defendants wherever found. Within 90 days of the dfts' first appearance, the parties shall complete all discovery. Cnsl for dfts shall provide to the pla all medical records, etc. pertinent to the issues in this case, within 20 days of the dfts' first appearance. Discovery shall proceed as stated herein. Within 120 days of the dft's first appearance, the parties shall file cross motions for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 5/19/2008. (JDL, )
May 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STAY Order...This case is STAYED for a period of 30 days...A copy of this order, together with a copy of the complaint and any amended complaint(s) shall be sent to William Kline... Record of Administrative Proceedings (or failure to exhaust) due by 6/18/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 5/19/2008. (JDL, )
May 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. It is ordered that the plaintiff pay an initial partial filing fee of $19.67 in accordance with 28 USC 1915. A copy of this order shall be sent to the plaintiff and to Centralized Inmate Banking. Filing Fee due by 6/9/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 5/19/2008. (JDL, )
January 9, 2008 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (JKH, )
January 9, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Gregory J. Jeanlouis. (Attachments: #1 pgs. 56-112, #2 pgs. 113-168, #3 pgs. 169-223, #4 Exhibit)(JKH, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeanlouis v. State of Louisiana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Escue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Dodd
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Unknown Cadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Bueche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Duporte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl L. Ranatza
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Coody
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Leblanc
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Unknown Pregean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Unknown Piddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Williams
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond McNeil
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristy Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Stalder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 19th JDC, Clerk of Court Office Deputy Clerks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Post Office (Angola)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Unknown Dykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Wackespack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Midkiff
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Unknown Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Quiet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown McKey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornell Hubert
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Stagg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlene Haydel
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Vannoy
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lora Rodrigue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Blanco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSP Mail Room
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Honeycutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melina Meiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Darborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Welborn
Represented By: Edmond Wade Shows
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Cody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Price
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Unknown Slyvester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. William Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. William Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSP Disiplinary Appeal Office
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State Penitentary (LSP) ARP Office
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Michel
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Ramsey
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Col. Unknown Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Robertson
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States District Court, Middle District of Louisiana Clerk Office Deputy Clerks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Bail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken August
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Unknown Reinbow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trish Foster
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shar Huffman
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Roundtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Desporte
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Sterlings
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Calvert
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delilah Delee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Mia Tran
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald Ladmirault
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Byargeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda Matthews
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Simmions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Calvert
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie R. Pendoarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Dwayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State Penitentary LSP Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Lanchney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jacobs, Jr.
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory J. Jeanlouis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?