Chevron U.S.A. Inc. v. Energen Resources Corporation

Plaintiff: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Defendant: Energen Resources Corporation
Case Number: 3:2008cv00076
Filed: February 5, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2009 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 112 Joint Motion for Dismissal of Main Demand with Reservation of Rights. The complaint filed by Chevron against Energen is DISMISSED, with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that all rights and claims asserted by Energen against third-party deft Kerr-McGee Oil and Gas Onshore, LP are RESERVED. Party Energen Resources Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/13/2009. (JDL, )
August 4, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 55 Chevron's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/4/2009. (JDL, )
July 17, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 54 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Southern Bay Energy LLC. and Energen's claims against Southern Bay are hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/17/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chevron U.S.A. Inc. v. Energen Resources Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energen Resources Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Leonard L. Kilgore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?