Gator Tail, L.L.C. v. Mud Buddy, L.L.C. d/b/a Mud Buddy Manufacturing

Plaintiff: Gator Tail, L.L.C. and Kyle Broussard
Defendant: Mud Buddy, L.L.C. d/b/a Mud Buddy Manufacturing
Case Number: 3:2008cv00125
Filed: February 28, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2014 146 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth, the Court finds that the evidence clearly and convincingly proves: (1) all asserted claims of the patents-in-suit are invalid due to obviousness; (2) United States Patent Number 7,052,340 is invalid due to lack of written description; and (3) Claims 1, 8, and 14 of United States Patent Number 7,052,340 and Claim 1 of the United States Patent Number 7,297,035 are each invalid due to lack of definiteness. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' respective requests for declaratory judgment of invalidity of the asserted claims of the patents-in-suit (08cv-00124 Doc. 22; 08-cv-00125 Doc. 9) are GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter final judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs in civil actions 3:08-cv-00124-BAJ-RLB Kyle Broussard, et al. v. Go-Devil Manufacturing Co. of La., Inc. d/b/a Go-Devil Manufacturers of Louisiana, Inc. and 3:08-cv-00125-BAJ-RLB Gator Tail, et al. v. Mud Buddy, LLC d/b/a Mud Buddy Manufacturing. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 07/09/2014. (NLT)
June 5, 2014 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The parties shall submit briefs on whether the patents-in-suit are void for lack of definiteness no later than 6/13/2014. The Parties' briefs shall be limited to no more than 7 pages, and shall otherwise be in accordance with this Court&# 039;s Local Rules. In addition to addressing whether the patents-in-suit are invalid for lack of definiteness in light of the Supreme Court's Nautilus decision, the Parties' briefs shall address whether Defendants waived the issue of invalidity for lack of definiteness "by failing to properly raise that argument in their post-trial briefs. Brief due by 6/13/2014. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 6/5/2014. (SMG)
January 23, 2014 133 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER granting 119 Motion to Strike 115 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Patent Invalidity with incorporated Memorandum in Support and Statement of Material Facts. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/23/2014. (SMG)
July 29, 2011 99 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Defendant'smotion in limine [doc. 49] to exclude the Mud Buddy and Gator Tail boat motorsfrom the forthcoming Markman hearing is HEREBY DENIED. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 7/28/2011. (PJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gator Tail, L.L.C. v. Mud Buddy, L.L.C. d/b/a Mud Buddy Manufacturing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gator Tail, L.L.C.
Represented By: Juston M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Broussard
Represented By: Juston M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mud Buddy, L.L.C. d/b/a Mud Buddy Manufacturing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?