Fields v. Coody et al

Plaintiff: Leroy Fields
Defendant: Shirley Coody, Jimmy Smith, K. Juneu, Unknown Chad, Unknown Lamana and Unknown Turner
Case Number: 3:2008cv00175
Filed: March 26, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 35 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The parties' cross motions for summary judgment are DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/2/2009. (NLT, )
November 5, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS amending 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Leroy Fields,and 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jimmy Smith, Unknown Lamana, Shirley Coody...It is the recommendation of the magistrate judge as amended herein, that the parties' cross motions for summary judgment be denied. Objections to R&R due by 11/20/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 11/5/09. (BP, )
October 21, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Leroy Fields, 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jimmy Smith, Unknown Lamana, Shirley Coody...It is recommended that the parties cross motions for summary judgment be denied. It is further recommended that the pltfs claims against K. Juneu, Capt. Chad and Sgt. Turner be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCP 4(m)... Objections to R&R due by 11/4/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 10/20/2009. (JDL, )
July 27, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Pltfs 23 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is denied. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/27/2009. (JDL, )
February 10, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 23 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. FURTHER ORDERED that the 23 Pltfs Motion/Request for Preliminary Injunction be referred to the trial of this case. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/9/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields v. Coody et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Coody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Juneu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Chad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Lamana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?